EP3599239 - METAL ORGANIC FRAMEWORKS AND METHODS FOR USING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecole Polytechnique Federale De Lausanne (EPFL) EPFL-TTO EPFL Innovation Park J 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2020/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STYLIANOU, Kyriakos Avenue Maurice Troillet 103 1950 Sion / CH | 02 /
SMIT, Berend Chemin des Chantres 6C 1025 St-Sulpice / CH | 03 /
EBRAHIM, Fatmah Ch. du Vieux Canal 15 1950 Sion / CH | 04 /
NGUYEN, Ngoc Tu Rue du Stade 8 1950 Sion / CH | 05 /
SHYSHKANOV, Serhii Av. Eglantine 24 1006 Lausanne / CH | 06 /
DYSON, Paul Ch. de l'Ormet 79 1024 Ecublens / CH | [2020/05] | Representative(s) | KATZAROV S.A. Geneva Business Center 12 Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/05] | KATZAROV S.A. European Patent Attorneys 12, Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | Application number, filing date | 18185301.1 | 24.07.2018 | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3599239 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, B01J20/22, G01N33/00, G01N21/00, G01N33/18 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
C07F5/027 (EP);
B01J20/226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLORGANISCHE RAHMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/05] | English: | METAL ORGANIC FRAMEWORKS AND METHODS FOR USING THEREOF | [2020/05] | French: | CADRES DE TRAVAIL MÉTALLO-ORGANIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/01] | 19.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - Kyriakos C Stylianou ET AL, "Design and Synthesis of MOF-Sensors for the Detection of Excess Fluoride Levels in Drinking Water", https://az659834.vo.msecnd.net/eventsairseasiaprod/production-uoaevents-public/ad5aa30efed94e92b235ab601e54dab4, (20180713), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://az659834.vo.msecnd.net/eventsairseasiaprod/production-uoaevents-public/ad5aa30efed94e92b235ab601e54dab4, (20190103), XP055538007 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [ ] - K C Stylianou, "Design and Synthesis of MOF-Sensors for the Detection of Excess Fluoride Levels in Drinking Water", https://az659834.vo.msecnd.net/eventsairseasiaprod/production-uoaevents-public/ad5aa30efed94e92b235ab601e54dab4, (20180713), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://az659834.vo.msecnd.net/eventsairseasiaprod/production-uoaevents-public/ad5aa30efed94e92b235ab601e54dab4, (20190103), XP055538008 | [X] - YAN LIU ET AL, "Porous and Robust Lanthanide Metal-Organoboron Frameworks as Water Tolerant Lewis Acid Catalysts", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON, US, (20130916), vol. 52, no. 18, doi:10.1021/ic400598x, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 10286 - 10291, XP055538009 [X] 1-13 * figure 1 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic400598x | [XY] - SAMUEL G. DUNNING ET AL, "A Sensor for Trace H 2 O Detection in D 2 O", CHEM, (20170401), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.chempr.2017.02.010, ISSN 2451-9294, pages 579 - 589, XP055540106 [X] 1-4,6-8,10,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * reference 11 *; page 580, line 5 - line 9 * [Y] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chempr.2017.02.010 | [Y] - JING-MIN ZHOU ET AL, "Highly Selective Luminescent Sensing of Fluoride and Organic Small-Molecule Pollutants Based on Novel Lanthanide Metal-Organic Frameworks", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON, US, (20130702), vol. 52, no. 14, doi:10.1021/ic400770j, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 8082 - 8090, XP055539009 [Y] 14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [Introduction] , [ Conclusions] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic400770j | by applicant | WO2016162810 | - YAMAGUCHI et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20010000), vol. 123, pages 11372 - 11375 | - YANG et al., Anal. Chem., (20170000), vol. 89, pages 1930 - 1936 |