EP3599596 - VEHICLE, APPARATUS, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR MONITORING A VEHICLE, APPLICATION SERVER, APPARATUS, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR AN APPLICATION SERVER, MOBILE TRANSCEIVER, APPARATUS, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR AN MOBILE TRANSCEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | |||
For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | |||
Former [2020/05] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | |||
For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hehn, Thorsten Kipfenerger Str. 125A 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
Cerwall, Joakim Döbelnsgatan 69 11352 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
Zielinski, Ernst Glockengarten 8c 44803 Bochum / DE | 04 /
Alieiev, Roman Schönbeckstr. 18 39576 Stendal / DE | 05 /
Buburuzan, Teodor Calvördestraße 16 38118 Braunschweig / DE | [2020/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2020/05] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18185621.2 | 25.07.2018 | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3599596 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G08G1/0967 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
G08G1/162 (EP);
G08G1/096791 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] |
Former [2020/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG, VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS, ANWENDUNGSSERVER, VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM FÜR EINEN ANWENDUNGSSERVER, MOBILER SENDEEMPFÄNGER, VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM FÜR EINEN MOBILEN SENDEEMPFÄNGER | [2020/05] | English: | VEHICLE, APPARATUS, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR MONITORING A VEHICLE, APPLICATION SERVER, APPARATUS, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR AN APPLICATION SERVER, MOBILE TRANSCEIVER, APPARATUS, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR AN MOBILE TRANSCEIVER | [2020/05] | French: | VÉHICULE, APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR SURVEILLER UN VÉHICULE, SERVEUR D'APPLICATION, APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR UN SERVEUR D'APPLICATION, ÉMETTEUR-RÉCEPTEUR MOBILE, APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR UN ÉMETTEUR-RÉCEPTEUR MOBILE | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 29.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2024 | 14.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/43] | 24.06.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/43] | 27.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1288887 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [I] 7-10,13,15 * paragraphs [0178] - [0181] ** figure 18 *; | [XI]US2009231429 (HARDEE CHRISTOPHER JAMES [US], et al) [X] 7,8,10,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 16] , [0 17] , [0 39] , [0 44] * * figures 1-4 * * claims 1-3 * [I] 9; | [XI]JP2009288915 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 7,8,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 6] , [00 9] , [0 10] , [0 29] - [0033] - [0 37] * * figure 2 * [I] 9; | [X]US2014324247 (JUN DONG SOK [KR]) [X] 7-10,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] , [0 42] , [0 50] , [0 53] , [0 89] , [0 90] , [0 93] * * figures 1-5 * * claims 1, 3 *; | [X]EP3109834 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 7-10,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0130] - [0132] - [ 152] - [0157] - [ 164] - [0166] * * figures 7, 8, 10, 11 * * claims 1, 2 * | by applicant | EP1367408 | EP1464540 | EP2750116 | EP2905704 |