EP3434334 - ENHANCED VISION FOR FIREFIGHTER USING HEADS UP DISPLAY AND GESTURE SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATIL, Swapnil Gopal HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
BHASKARWAR, Rahul Ramesh HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
B, Nikhil HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 18185632.9 | 25.07.2018 | [2019/05] | Priority number, date | IN201711026558 | 26.07.2017 Original published format: IN201711026558 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3434334 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/08, A42B3/04, G02B27/01 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
A62B18/02 (CN);
G02B27/0172 (US);
A62B18/08 (EP,US);
A62B18/082 (CN);
G02B27/0176 (US);
G06F3/017 (CN,US);
H04N23/23 (EP,CN);
H04N5/33 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE SICHT FÜR FEUERWEHRLEUTE DURCH HEADS-UP-DISPLAY UND GESTENERKENNUNG | [2019/05] | English: | ENHANCED VISION FOR FIREFIGHTER USING HEADS UP DISPLAY AND GESTURE SENSING | [2019/05] | French: | VISION AMÉLIORÉE POUR POMPIER UTILISANT UN AFFICHAGE TÊTE HAUTE ET UNE DÉTECTION DE GESTE | [2019/05] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 12.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2013112195 (SMITH CLINT [US]); | [Y]US2015217145 (TEETZEL JAMES W [US]); | [Y]EP3104257 (BOS CONNECT GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]WO2017062709 (SCOTT TECH INC [US]); | [XYI]US2017123211 (LAVOIE BARRY [US]) |