EP3431115 - CATHETER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIS GMBH AACHEN INNOVATIVE SOLUTIONS Feldstr. 8 52070 Aachen / DE | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeffer, Joachim Georg Feldstr. 8 52070 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Schmitz-Rode, Thomas Kupferstr. 22 52070 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Günther, Rolf W. Preusweg 28 52074 Aachen / DE | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18185980.2 | 27.08.2008 | [2019/04] | Priority number, date | EP20070019657 | 08.10.2007 Original published format: EP 07019657 | [2019/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431115 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A61M60/419 (EP,US);
A61M60/13 (EP,US);
A61M60/237 (EP,US);
A61M60/808 (EP,US);
A61M60/81 (EP,US);
A61M60/825 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | A61M1/10, A61B17/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KATHETER-VORRICHTUNG | [2019/04] | English: | CATHETER DEVICE | [2019/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CATHETER | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 12.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08785717.3 / EP2234658 | EP10008269.2 / EP2366412 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8809874 (KLETSCHKA HAROLD D [US]); | [A]US5147186 (BUCKHOLTZ DWIGHT A [US]); | [Y]US2003135086 (KHAW KENNETH [US], et al) | by applicant | US4753221 | WO8905668 | EP0364293 | EP0445782 | US5376114 | WO9944651 | WO0117581 | US6245007 | DE10059714 | JP4126158B |