EP3428242 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HFC-1225YE AND CO2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chemours Company FC, LLC 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19801 / US | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rao, Velliyur Nott Mallikarjuna - deceased / US | 02 /
Minor, Barbara Haviland 233 Greenhaven Drive Elkton, MD Maryland 21921 / US | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastrasse 17 81925 München / DE | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 18186309.3 | 03.03.2006 | [2019/03] | Priority number, date | US20050658543P | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 658543 P | US20050710439P | 23.08.2005 Original published format: US 710439 P | US20050732769P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732769 P | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428242 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C09K3/30, C08J9/14, C10M171/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
C10M171/008 (EP);
C08J9/146 (EP);
C08J9/149 (EP);
C09K5/045 (EP);
C08J2203/12 (EP);
C08J2203/14 (EP);
C08J2203/162 (EP);
C08J2203/182 (EP);
C08J2207/04 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP);
C09K2205/126 (EP);
C09K2205/22 (EP);
C09K2205/32 (EP);
C09K2205/40 (EP);
C10M2203/065 (EP);
C10M2203/1006 (EP);
C10M2205/0206 (EP);
C10M2207/2835 (EP);
C10M2209/043 (EP);
C10M2209/1033 (EP);
C10N2020/101 (EP);
C10N2020/103 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT HFC-1225YE UND CO2 | [2019/03] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HFC-1225YE AND CO2 | [2019/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPORTANT DU HFC-1225YE ET DU CO2 | [2019/03] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 17.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06737345.6 / EP1853679 | EP08014611.1 / EP1985680 | EP18182081.2 / EP3425017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04110388 ; | [A]US2004127383 (PHAM HANG T [US], et al); | [A]US2004256594 (SINGH RAJIV R [US], et al); | by applicant | US5759430 | USRE36951E | US20040910495 | US20050062044 |