EP3415620 - ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS VECTORS FOR TREATMENT OF GLYCOGEN STORAGE DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States of America, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325, MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20852-7660 / US | [2019/13] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states The United States of America, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325, MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20852-7660 / US | ||
For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, FL 32611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Janice, J. NIH/NICHD Building 10 Room 9D42 Bethesda, MD 20892 / US | [2019/04] |
Former [2018/51] | 01 /
CHOU, Janice, J. NIH/NICHD Building 10 Room 9D42 Bethesda, MD 20892 / US | ||
02 /
BYRNE, Barry, J. University of Florida Child Health Research Institute PO Box 100296 Gainsville, FL 32610-0296 / US | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/13] |
Former [2018/51] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18186594.0 | 25.11.2014 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | US201361908861P | 26.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361908861 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415620 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3415620 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/16, A61K48/00, C12N15/86, A61P1/16, A61P3/06, A61P3/08, A61P3/10, A61P13/12, A61P19/06 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K48/0008 (US);
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
A61K48/0066 (EP,US);
A61K48/0075 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C12N7/00 (US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12Y301/03009 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | C12N9/16, A61K48/00, C12N15/86 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2018/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ADENOASSOZIIERTE VIRUSVEKTOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER GLYKOGENSPEICHERKRANKHEIT | [2018/51] | English: | ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS VECTORS FOR TREATMENT OF GLYCOGEN STORAGE DISEASE | [2018/51] | French: | VECTEURS DE TYPE VIRUS ADÉNO-ASSOCIÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIE DU STOCKAGE DU GLYCOGÈNE | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 19.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14812375.5 / EP3074510 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2014 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | IT | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | IE | 25.11.2021 | LU | 25.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/36] | HU | 25.11.2014 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 25.11.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.11.2014 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 25.11.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 25.11.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 25.11.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2412387 (PROYECTO BIOMEDICINA CIMA SL [ES]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0182] *; | [YD] - WAI HAN YIU ET AL, "Complete Normalization of Hepatic G6PC Deficiency in Murine Glycogen Storage Disease Type Ia Using Gene Therapy", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (20100413), vol. 18, no. 6, doi:10.1038/mt.2010.64, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 1076 - 1084, XP055174494 [YD] 1-15 * page 1083 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2010.64 | [YD] - LEE YOUNG MOK ET AL, "The upstream enhancer elements of theG6PCpromoter are critical for optimal G6PC expression in murine glycogen storage disease type Ia", MOLECULAR GENETICS AND METABOLISM, (20130625), vol. 110, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.YMGME.2013.06.014, ISSN 1096-7192, pages 275 - 280, XP028754654 [YD] 1-15 * page 275 - page 279 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymgme.2013.06.014 | [Y] - ZHIJIAN WU ET AL, "Optimization of Self-complementary AAV Vectors for Liver-directed Expression Results in Sustained Correction of Hemophilia B at Low Vector Dose", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (200802), vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1038/sj.mt.6300355, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 280 - 289, XP055097643 [Y] 1-15 * page 283 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.mt.6300355 | [Y] - GRIEGER J C ET AL, "PACKAGING CAPACITY OF ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS SEROTYPES: IMPACT OF LARGER GENOMES ON INFECTIVITY AND POSTENTRY STEPS", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200508), vol. 79, no. 15, doi:10.1128/JVI.79.15.9933-9944.2005, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 9933 - 9944, XP009054356 [Y] 1-15 * figures 1, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.79.15.9933-9944.2005 | [A] - JANICE Y. CHOU ET AL, "Mutations in the glucose-6-phosphatase-[alpha] (G6PC) gene that cause type Ia glycogen storage disease", HUMAN MUTATION, US, (200807), vol. 29, no. 7, doi:10.1002/humu.20772, ISSN 1059-7794, pages 921 - 930, XP055512547 [A] 4,6 * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/humu.20772 | by applicant | US2011229971 | US2012100606 | US2012135515 | US2012219528 | US2013072548 | - CHOU et al., Nat Rev Endocrinol, (20100000), vol. 6, pages 676 - 688 | - GREENE, NEngl J Med, (19760000), vol. 294, pages 423 - 425 | - CHEN et al., N Engl J Med, (19840000), vol. 310, pages 171 - 175 | - LABRUNE et al., JPediatr Gastroenterol Nutr, (19970000), vol. 24, pages 276 - 279 | - RAKE et al., Eur JPediatr, (20020000), vol. 161, no. 1, pages S20 - S34 | - RAKE et al., Eur J Pediatr, (20020000), vol. 161, no. 1, pages S20 - S34 | - FRANCO et al., J Inherit Metab Dis, (20050000), vol. 28, pages 153 - 162 | - CHOU; MANSFIELD, Expert Op in Biol Ther, (20110000), vol. 11, pages 1011 - 1024 | - GHOSH et al., Gene Ther, (20060000), vol. 13, pages 321 - 329 | - KOEBERL et al., Gene Ther, (20060000), vol. 13, pages 1281 - 1289 | - KOEBERL et al., Mol Ther, (20080000), vol. 16, pages 665 - 672 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, Gene, (19880000), vol. 73, pages 237 - 44 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, CABIOS, (19890000), vol. 5, pages 151 - 3 | - CORPET et al., Nuc. Acids Res., (19880000), vol. 16, pages 10881 - 90 | - HUANG et al., Computer Appls. in the Biosciences, (19920000), vol. 8, pages 155 - 65 | - PEARSON et al., Meth. Mol. Bio., (19940000), vol. 24, pages 307 - 31 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - YIU et al., Mol Ther, (20100000), vol. 18, pages 1076 - 1084 | - LEE et al., Hepatology, (20120000), vol. 56, pages 1719 - 1729 | - LEE et al., Mol Genet Metab., (20130000), vol. 110, no. 3, pages 275 - 280 | - DAYA; BERNS, Clin Microbiol Rev, (20080000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 583 - 593 | - GHOSH et al., Gene Ther, (20060000), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 321 - 329 | - XU et al., Hum Gene Ther, (20010000), vol. 12, pages 563 - 573 | - LEI et al., Nat Genet, (19960000), vol. 13, pages 203 - 209 | - TEUTSCH, Prog Histochem Cytochem, (19810000), vol. 14, pages 1 - 92 | - GHOSH et al., JBiol Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, pages 32837 - 32842 | - CUNNINGHAM et al., Mol Ther, (20080000), vol. 16, pages 1081 - 1088 | - XU, Hum Gene Ther, (20010000), vol. 12, pages 563 - 573 | - BROOKS et al., J Gene Med, (20040000), vol. 6, pages 395 - 404 | - MEHTA et al., Gene, (20090000), vol. 428, pages 20 - 24 | - KIM et al., J Hepatol, (20080000), vol. 48, pages 479 - 485 | - CHOU et al., Curr Mol Med, (20020000), vol. 2, pages 121 - 143 | - CHOU, Curr Mol Med, (20020000), vol. 2, pages 121 - 143 | - LIU et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (19940000), vol. 205, pages 680 - 686 | - ANTINOZZI et al., Annu Rev Nutr, (19990000), vol. 19, pages 511 - 544 | - CLORE et al., Diabetes, (20000000), vol. 49, pages 969 - 974 | - YOSHIZAWA et al., J Clin Invest, (20090000), vol. 119, pages 2807 - 2817 | - BAHARY, Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 8642 - 8646 | - BAHARY et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 8642 - 8646 | - KIM et al., JHepatol, (20080000), vol. 48, pages 479 - 485 | - MUTEL et al., J Hepatol, (20110000), vol. 54, pages 529 - 537 | - WU, Cancer Treat Rev, (20060000), vol. 32, pages 28 - 44 | - LEAVENS; BIRNBAUM, Crit Rev Biochem Mol Biol, (20110000), vol. 46, pages 200 - 215 | - DE LUCA et al., J Clin Invest, (20050000), vol. 115, pages 3484 - 3493 | - LEAVENS; BIRNBAUM, Crit Rev Biochem Mol Bioi, (20110000), vol. 46, pages 200 - 215 | - MASSA et al., IUBMB Life, (20110000), vol. 63, pages 1 - 6 | - HANSON; RESHEF, Biochimie, (20030000), vol. 85, pages 1199 - 1205 | - HERS, J Inherit Metab Dis, (19900000), vol. 13, pages 395 - 410 | - WAMELINK et al., J Inherit Metab Dis, (20080000), vol. 31, pages 703 - 717 | - ARION et al., JBiol Chem, (19760000), vol. 251, pages 6784 - 690 | - ZINGONE et al., J Biol Chem, (20000000), vol. 275, pages 828 - 832 | - LEI et al., Nat. Genet., (19960000), vol. 13, pages 203 - 209 | - YIU et al., Mol. Ther., (20100000), vol. 18, pages 1076 - 1084 | - KOEBERL et al., Mol. Ther., (20080000), vol. 16, pages 665 - 672 | - CUNNINGHAM, Mol. Ther., (20080000), vol. 16, pages 1081 - 1088 | - CHOU et al., Curr. Mol. Med., (20020000), vol. 2, pages 121 - 143 | - CHOU et al., Nat. Rev. Endocrinol., (20100000), vol. 6, pages 676 - 688 | - CHOU et al., Curro Mol. Med., (20020000), vol. 2, pages 121 - 143 |