EP3432525 - CONTROL APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, VIRTUAL NETWORK MANAGEMENT METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Syuuhei NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 18186653.4 | 26.10.2012 | [2019/04] | Priority number, date | JP20110237075 | 28.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011237075 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3432525 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3432525 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/70, H04L12/46, H04L12/24, H04L12/721 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/50 (US);
H04L41/00 (EP,US);
H04L41/0803 (EP,US);
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L12/4641 (EP,US);
H04L45/38 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] |
Former [2019/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES VIRTUELLEN NETZWERKS UND PROGRAMM | [2019/04] | English: | CONTROL APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, VIRTUAL NETWORK MANAGEMENT METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2019/04] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE RÉSEAU VIRTUEL ET PROGRAMME | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 28.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.06.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 17.06.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 27.07.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 19.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12844444.5 / EP2773072 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009138577 (CASADO MARTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] ** paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0096] *; | [A]US7586915 (INDIRESAN ATRI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7 - column 12; figures 2-8 * | by applicant | JP2007036959 | WO2008095010 | - NICK MCKEOWN, OpenFlow: Enabling Innovation in Campus Networks, (20111001), URL: http://www.openflow.org/documents/openflow-wp-latest.pdf | - OpenFlow Switch Specification, (20111001), URL: http://www.openflow.org/documents/openflow-spec-v1.1.0.pdf |