Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10919476 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2021 | B2 | US2019111874 | 18.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017202154 | 18.10.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6881219B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | B2 | JP2019075015 | 16.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017202154 | 18.10.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109677348B | Global Dossier | 10.09.2021 | B | CN109677348 | 26.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017202154 | 18.10.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3474255 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2021 | B1 | EP3474255 | 24.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017202154 | 18.10.2017 |