EP3442197 - SIP METHOD AND SIP PROXY FOR HANDLING CALLS IN A VOIP NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states ORANGE 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states ORANGE 78 rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states Orange 78 rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASCUAL, Juan 21 Cours Saint-Vincent 92130 ISSY-LES-MOULINEAUX / FR | 02 /
FOUQUET, Stéphane 8 rue des Bochoux 92150 SURESNES / FR | 03 /
LABRANCHE, Miguel 6 rue de la Révolution des Oeillets 94380 BONNEUIL-SUR-MARNE / FR | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 18186957.9 | 02.08.2018 | [2019/07] | Priority number, date | FR20170057622 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: FR 1757622 | [2019/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442197 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42 | [2024/44] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1045 (US);
H04L61/2528 (US);
H04L65/1073 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | H04L29/06, H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] |
Former [2019/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIP-VERFAHREN UND SIP-PROXY ZUR HANDHABUNG VON ANRUFEN IN EINEM VOIP-NETZWERK | [2019/07] | English: | SIP METHOD AND SIP PROXY FOR HANDLING CALLS IN A VOIP NETWORK | [2019/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET PROXY SIP DE GESTION DES APPELS DANS UN RÉSEAU DE VOIX SUR IP | [2019/07] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 17.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003007482 (KHELLO ROBERT [SE], et al); | [A]US2003123432 (CHENG SHIH-AN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008071891 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) |