EP3438005 - MATERIAL CONFIGURATION ENABLING FLEXIBILITY OF A STRUCTURE USING RIGID COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states StemRad Ltd. 4 Raoul Wallenburg Street 6971904 Tel Aviv / IL | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILSTEIN, Oren 20 Hatanaim Street, Apt 5 6920915 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
WATERMAN, Gideon 3 Yad HaMa'avir, Apartment 8A 6951006 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
BARON, Meytal 3 Kehilat Varsha Hadar Yosef 6970011 Tel Aviv / IL | 04 /
NIX, Tamar 32 Ruth Street Haifa, 3440439 / IL | 05 /
JAIN, Payal 127-325 Bogert Avenue North York Toronto, Ontario M2N 1L8 / CA | [2019/12] |
Former [2019/06] | 01 /
MILSTEIN, Oren 20 Hatanaim Street, Apt 5 6920915 Tel Aviv / IL | ||
02 /
WATERMAN, Gideon 3 Yad HaMa'avir, Apartment 8A 6951006 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
BARON, Meytal 3 Kehilat Varsha Hadar Yosef 6970011 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
04 /
NIX, Tamar 32 Ruth Street 6970011 Haifa / IL | |||
05 /
JAIN, Payal 127-325 Bogert Avenue North York Toronto, Ontario M2N 1L8 / CA | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2023/22] |
Former [2019/06] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 16 Upper Woburn Place London WC1H 0BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18187144.3 | 02.08.2018 | [2019/06] | Priority number, date | US201762540127P | 02.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762540127 P | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438005 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3438005 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64G6/00, G21F1/02, G21F1/08, G21F1/10, G21F1/12, G21F3/025 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G21F3/025 (EP,US);
A41D31/325 (US);
B64G6/00 (EP,US);
G21F1/023 (EP,US);
G21F1/08 (EP,US);
G21F1/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | B64G6/00, G21F3/025 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] |
Former [2019/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MATERIALKONFIGURATION ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DER FLEXIBILITÄT EINER STRUKTUR MIT STARREN KOMPONENTEN | [2019/06] | English: | MATERIAL CONFIGURATION ENABLING FLEXIBILITY OF A STRUCTURE USING RIGID COMPONENTS | [2019/06] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE MATÉRIAU FACILITANT LA FLEXIBILITÉ D'UNE STRUCTURE À L'AIDE DE COMPOSANTS RIGIDES | [2019/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 01.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | IE | 02.08.2023 | LU | 02.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
IE | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012154962 (STEMRAD LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US2014021377 (KHANDKAR ASHOK [US], et al); | [A]WO2014163574 (TEN MEDICAL DESIGN AB [SE]); | [XI]WO2016147193 (STEMRAD LTD [IL]); |