EP3605376 - BLOCKCHAIN-BASED DISTRIBUTION OF MEDICAL DATA RECORDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜGER, Benedikt, Dr. Blumenstr. 9 96250 Ebensfeld / DE | 02 /
TAYLOR, Robert James, Dr. 1487 Noe Street 94131 San Francisco / US | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18187291.2 | 03.08.2018 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605376 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60, G16H10/60 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G06F16/9566 (US);
G06F21/60 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (US);
G06Q20/401 (US);
G06Q2220/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLOCKCHAIN-BASIERTE VERTEILUNG VON MEDIZINISCHEN DATENSÄTZEN | [2020/06] | English: | BLOCKCHAIN-BASED DISTRIBUTION OF MEDICAL DATA RECORDS | [2020/06] | French: | DISTRIBUTION D'ENREGISTREMENTS DE DONNÉES MÉDICALES À BASE DE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015175722 (NANT HOLDINGS IP LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0069] *; | [Y]US2016098723 (FEENEY PATRICK JOSEPH [US]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0050] *; | [I]WO2016189488 (GUPTA VISHAL [IN]) [I] 1-7,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0040] , [0059] , [0060] *; | [A]WO2017136643 (LUTHER SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 8* page 16, paragraph 2 *; | [IY]WO2018115992 (ITEXT GROUP [BE]) [I] 1-12,14,15 * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * [Y] 13; | [I]US10025941 (GRIFFIN PHILLIP H [US], et al) [I] 1-7,10-12,14,15 * column 8, paragraph 2 * * column 9, lines 48-65 * |