Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024011179 | ![]() | 11.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870830 | 25.04.2013 | US202117345719 | 11.06.2021 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201715581544 | 28.04.2017 | US202016894691 | 05.06.2020 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | US202318137877 | 21.04.2023 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021027903 | ![]() | 28.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870830 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201715581544 | 28.04.2017 | US202016894691 | 05.06.2020 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019221325 | ![]() | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201715581544 | 28.04.2017 | US201916252989 | 21.01.2019 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017271036 | ![]() | 21.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870830 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201715581544 | 28.04.2017 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013301769 | ![]() | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870830 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11661668 | ![]() | 30.05.2023 | B2 | US2021335515 | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870830 | 25.04.2013 | US202117345719 | 11.06.2021 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201715581544 | 28.04.2017 | US202016894691 | 05.06.2020 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7644154B | ![]() | 11.03.2025 | B2 | JP2023052329 | 11.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | JP2021106933 | 28.06.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7210648B | ![]() | 23.01.2023 | B2 | JP2022063838 | 22.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | JP2019228535 | 18.12.2019 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015523460 | ![]() | 13.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4216680 | ![]() | 26.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18187378 | 25.04.2013 | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | EP16200459 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | EP13781369 | 25.04.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3454346 | ![]() | 22.09.2021 | B1 | EP3454346 | 29.05.2019 | A3 | EP3454346 | 13.03.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | EP16200459 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | EP13781369 | 25.04.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3389346 | ![]() | 01.04.2020 | B1 | EP3389346 | 17.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | EP16200459 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | EP13781369 | 25.04.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3197246 | ![]() | 04.09.2019 | B1 | EP3197246 | 26.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | EP13781369 | 25.04.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2841607 | ![]() | 28.12.2016 | B1 | EP2841607 | 07.10.2015 | A4 | EP2841607 | 04.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108160988B | ![]() | 08.01.2021 | B | CN108160988 | 15.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201380034224 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105750538B | ![]() | 26.01.2018 | B | CN105750538 | 13.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201380034224 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104508158B | ![]() | 22.02.2017 | B | CN104508158 | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3030670 | ![]() | 28.07.2020 | C | CA3030670 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2991516 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3030502 | ![]() | 27.04.2021 | C | CA3030502 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2991516 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2991516 | ![]() | 22.09.2020 | C | CA2991516 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | CA2948541 | 25.04.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2948541 | ![]() | 20.02.2018 | C | CA2948541 | 16.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2915775 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2915775 | ![]() | 10.01.2017 | C | CA2915775 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2871305 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2871305 | ![]() | 01.03.2016 | C | CA2871305 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013252446 | ![]() | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3461240 | ![]() | 16.11.2022 | B1 | EP3461240 | 22.05.2019 | A3 | EP3461240 | 27.03.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | EP16200459 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | EP13781369 | 25.04.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3197246T | 07.10.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | EP13781369 | 25.04.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3389346T | 20.04.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | EP16200459 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3454346T | 01.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | EP16200459 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3461240T | 12.12.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | EP16200459 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3454346T | 28.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | EP16200459 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | EP13781369 | 25.04.2013 | EP18202130 | 25.04.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2639752 | 22.12.2017 | C2 | RU2014147619 | 20.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | WO2013CA00409 | 25.04.2013 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013159201 | ![]() | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7080873B | ![]() | 06.06.2022 | B2 | JP2020073717 | 14.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018095967 | ![]() | 21.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2895491T | 21.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2933507T | 09.02.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE057406T | 28.05.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE061211T | 28.05.2023 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3461240T | 20.03.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3454346T | 08.11.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3461240T | 21.02.2023 | T | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2692729 | 26.06.2019 | C2 | RU2017141622 | 13.02.2019 | A3 | RU2017141622 | 13.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261639408 | 27.04.2012 | US201261640610 | 30.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | EP4216680 | Type | ![]() | EP2841607 | EP3197246 |