EP3434787 - PHOSPHODIESTERASE 4D7 AS PROSTATE CANCER MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states University Court Of The University Of Glasgow University of Glasgow Gilbert Scott Building University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/05] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states University Court Of The University Of Glasgow University of Glasgow Gilbert Scott Building University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, Ralf c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HOUSLAY, Miles Douglas c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
HENDERSON, David James Peter c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/41] |
Former [2019/05] | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 18187420.7 | 11.05.2010 | [2019/05] | Priority number, date | EP20090159960 | 12.05.2009 Original published format: EP 09159960 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3434787 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3434787 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/11, C12Q1/44, C12N9/16, G01N33/574, C12Q1/6886, C12N15/113, C12N15/115, A61P13/08, A61P35/00, A61P43/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
C12N9/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G01N33/68 (US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/1137 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/115 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q1/44 (EP,CN,US);
C12Y301/04017 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/57434 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/6893 (KR);
C12N2310/113 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2310/141 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2310/16 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/118 (KR);
G01N2333/916 (CN,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | C12Q1/68, G01N33/574, C12N9/16, C12Q1/44, C12N15/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] |
Former [2019/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHOSPHODIESTERASE 4D7 ALS PROSTATAKREBS-MARKER | [2019/05] | English: | PHOSPHODIESTERASE 4D7 AS PROSTATE CANCER MARKER | [2019/05] | French: | PHOSPHODIESTÉRASE 4D7 EN TANT QUE MARQUEUR DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2019/05] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 30.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10726251.1 / EP2430191 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2002193612 (CHAMBERS ROBERT J [US], et al); | [XAI]WO03044170 (MEMORY PHARM CORP [US], et al); | [YA]US2003220273 (BENNETT C FRANK [US], et al); | [YA]WO2004042389 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2006099132 (SUPERGEN INC [US], et al); | [YA]WO2007134451 (TOPIGEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al); | [A]WO2008009479 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al); |