EP3438696 - AUTOMATED VEHICLE TRACKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Junsung 615 S Aiken Ave Pittsburgh, PA 15232 / US | 02 /
WEI, Junqing 8598 Christine Court Bridgeville, PA 15017 / US | 03 /
XU, Wenda 1240 Bellerock Street Pittsburgh, PA 15217 / US | [2019/21] |
Former [2019/06] | 01 /
KIM, Junsung 5701 Centre Avenue - Apt. 602 Pittsburgh, PA 15206 / US | ||
02 /
WEI, Junqing 8598 Christine Court Bridgeville, PA 15017 / US | |||
03 /
XU, Wenda 1 Bayard Road - Apt. 22 Pittsburgh, PA 15213 / US | Representative(s) | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 18187608.7 | 06.08.2018 | [2019/06] | Priority number, date | US201715669163 | 04.08.2017 Original published format: US201715669163 | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438696 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93, G01S17/93, B60W40/076, // G01S13/68, G01S17/66 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
B60W40/076 (EP,US);
B60W30/165 (CN);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G05D1/0061 (CN);
G05D1/0223 (US);
G05D1/0248 (US);
G05D1/0257 (US);
G05D1/0274 (US);
B60W2420/403 (EP);
B60W2420/408 (EP);
B60W2552/15 (CN);
B60W2554/00 (EP);
G01S13/68 (EP,US);
G01S17/66 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9318 (EP,US);
G01S2013/93185 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9319 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR AUTOMATISIERTES FAHRZEUG | [2019/06] | English: | AUTOMATED VEHICLE TRACKING SYSTEM | [2019/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUIVI DE VÉHICULE AUTOMATISÉ | [2019/06] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 07.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1736797 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0030]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]WO2016158491 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * figures 4,6-8 *; | [X]US2017162056 (FEYERABEND ACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] , [0042] , [0043] , [0045] , [0048] , [0057]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [P]US2018086337 (BABA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0022] , [0053] , [0059]; figures 1,3,4,6-8 * |