EP3607948 - TISSUE TRANSGLUTAMINASE MODULATORS FOR MEDICINAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aarhus Universitet Nordre Ringgade 1 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pérez, Estéfano Pinilla Vikærsvej 21, st. 8240 Risskov / DK | 02 /
Simonsen, Ulf Østermøllevej 13 8380 Trige / DK | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18187711.9 | 07.08.2018 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3607948 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61P9/10, A61P9/14, A61P9/08, A61P9/12 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (US);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBETRANSGLUTAMINASEMODULATOREN ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN VERWENDUNG | [2020/07] | English: | TISSUE TRANSGLUTAMINASE MODULATORS FOR MEDICINAL USE | [2020/07] | French: | MODULATEURS DE LA TRANSGLUTAMINASE TISSULAIRE POUR UTILISATION MÉDICALE | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006060702 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * compounds of Fig. 2-4; claims, in particular claims 24, 29; p. 1, last § *; | [A] - MATLUNG HANKE L ET AL, "Transglutaminase activity regulates atherosclerotic plaque composition at locations exposed to oscillatory shear stress", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (2012), vol. 224, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.ATHEROSCLEROSIS.2012.07.044, ISSN 0021-9150, pages 355 - 362, XP028942294 [A] 1-15 * title, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.atherosclerosis.2012.07.044 | [A] - MORTEN ENGHOLM ET AL, "Involvement of transglutaminase 2 and voltage-gated potassium channels in cystamine vasodilatation in rat mesenteric small arteries : Vasoactive effects of cystamine", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, UK, (20160127), vol. 173, no. 5, doi:10.1111/bph.13393, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 839 - 855, XP055551401 [A] 1-15 * title, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/bph.13393 | [A] - H TATSUKAWA ET AL, "Transglutaminase 2 has opposing roles in the regulation of cellular functions as well as cell growth and death", CELL DEATH & DISEASE, (20160601), vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.1038/cddis.2016.150, pages e2244 - e2244, XP055552630 [A] 1-15 * introduction: first § on p. 1; Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cddis.2016.150 | by applicant | US2006183759 | US8614233 | WO2014057266 | US2018002700 | - M. ENGHOLM et al., British J. Pharm., (20160000), vol. 173, pages 839 - 855 | - Y.J. OH et al., Amino Acids, (20170000), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 695 - 704 | - J. W. KEILLOR et al., Trends in pharmacological sciences, (20150000), vol. 36, no. 1 | - G.G. MIRONOV et al., Nature Chemical Biology, (20160000), vol. 12, pages 918 - 922 | - J.W. KEILLOR et al., Trends in pharmacological sciences, (20150000), vol. 36, no. 1 | - MCGRATH JC; LILLEY E, "Implementing guidelines on reporting research using animals (ARRIVE etc.): new requirements for publication", BJP. Br J Pharmacol, (20150000), vol. 172, pages 3189 - 3193 |