EP3447523 - TIME TO DIGITAL CONVERTER, DISTANCE MEASURING APPARATUS AND MOVING OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/09] | DISTANCE MEASURING APPARATUS, TIME TO DIGITAL CONVERTER, AND MOVING OBJECT | ||
[2024/31] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yujin Robot Co., Ltd. 33, Harmony-ro 187beon-gil, Yeonsu-gu Incheon, 22013 / KR | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Kyung Chul 106-203, 156, Pyeongchangmunhwa-ro Jongno-gu 03010 Seoul / KR | 02 /
PARK, Seong Ju 501, 3, Sanbon-ro 431beonan-gil, Gunpo-si 15820 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jae Young 1210-2301, 25, Sanbon-ro 432 beon-gil Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do, 15804 / KR | 04 /
CHEON, Moo Woong 102-302, 105, Yeonhyeon-ro79beon-gil, Manan-gu Anyang-si 13903 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Pace Napoleone, Maria, et al De Simone & Partners S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | Capasso, Olga, et al De Simone & Partners SpA Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 18187982.6 | 08.08.2018 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | KR20170105671 | 21.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170105671 | KR20170121401 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170121401 | KR20170121828 | 21.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170121828 | KR20170145577 | 02.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170145577 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447523 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481, G01S17/88, G01S5/16, G01S13/86, G01S13/87, G01S13/88, G01S17/42, G01S17/89, G01S17/93, G01S7/48, G01S7/486 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G01S7/481 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/93 (EP);
G01S7/4808 (EP);
G01S7/4811 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEIT-DIGITAL-WANDLER, DISTANZMESSVORRICHTUNG UND SICH BEWEGENDES OBJEKT | [2024/31] | English: | TIME TO DIGITAL CONVERTER, DISTANCE MEASURING APPARATUS AND MOVING OBJECT | [2024/31] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR TEMPS-NUMÉRIQUE, APPAREIL DE MESURE DE DISTANCE ET OBJET MOBILE | [2024/31] |
Former [2019/09] | DISTANZMESSVORRICHTUNG, ZEIT-DIGITAL-WANDLER UND SICH BEWEGENDES OBJEKT | ||
Former [2019/09] | DISTANCE MEASURING APPARATUS, TIME TO DIGITAL CONVERTER, AND MOVING OBJECT | ||
Former [2019/09] | APPAREIL DE MESURE DE DISTANCE, CONVERTISSEUR TEMPS-NUMÉRIQUE ET OBJET MOBILE | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 22.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101856208 (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING); | [A]US2014111812 (BAEG SEUNG-HO [KR], et al); | [XP]US2018149753 (SHIN KYUNG CHUL [KR], et al) |