EP3428329 - A FIBER COMPRISING A LOW CRYSTALLINITY POLYMER AND A HIGH CRYSTALLINITY POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2020/28] |
Former [2019/03] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Llc 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Rajen M 114 Scarlet Oak Street Lake Jackson, TX Texas 77566 / US | 02 /
Chang, Andy C 2301 Norfolk Street Apartment 3 Houston, TX Texas 77098 / US | 03 /
Peng, Hong 420 Garland Drive Apt. 1403 Lake Jackson, TX Texas 77566 / US | 04 /
Karande, Seema V. 2815 Pine Bend Drive Pearland, TX Texas 77584 / US | 05 /
Poon, Benjamin C. 10000 Broadway Apt. 773 Pearland, TX Texas 77584 / US | 06 /
Cheung, Yunwa Wilson 3 Corby Court Pittsford, NY New York 14534 / US | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 18188241.6 | 25.10.2006 | [2019/03] | Priority number, date | US20050730705P | 26.10.2005 Original published format: US 730705 P | US20050754087P | 27.12.2005 Original published format: US 754087 P | US20060824728P | 06.09.2006 Original published format: US 824728 P | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428329 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3428329 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D01F8/06 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
B32B7/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/022 (KR,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,KR,US);
D01F6/46 (EP,KR,US);
D01F8/06 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4291 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4374 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0253 (KR,US);
B32B2305/72 (KR,US);
B32B2307/514 (KR,US);
B32B2323/043 (KR,US);
B32B2323/046 (KR,US);
B32B2323/10 (KR,US);
B32B2437/00 (KR,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31587 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US);
Y10T442/668 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | FASER MIT EINEM POLYMER MIT NIEDRIGER KRISTALLINITÄT UND EINEM POLYMER MIT HOHER KRISTALLINITÄT | [2019/03] | English: | A FIBER COMPRISING A LOW CRYSTALLINITY POLYMER AND A HIGH CRYSTALLINITY POLYMER | [2019/03] | French: | FIBRE COMPRENANT UN POLYMÈRE À FAIBLE CRISTALLINITÉ ET UN POLYMÈRE À HAUTE CRISTALLINITÉ | [2019/03] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 04.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06839531.8 / EP1951511 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2006 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | ES | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | NL | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | SE | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2004063270 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 67] - [0080] - [0 85] - [0099]; claims 1-17 *; | [A]WO2005090427 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 121, line 15 - page 123, line 2; examples 5, 11, 17; claims 9-27; tables 4,5 * * page 76, line 31 - page 78, line 18 * * page 6, line 32 - page 8, line 20 * * page 115, line 10 - line 21 *; | [A]WO2005090425 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-17 * * page 64, lines 8-28 * * page 70, lines 8,9 ** claims 11-14 * | by applicant | US204017 | US4190602 | US4322027 | US4430563 | US4476180 | US4629643 | US4663220 | US4668566 | US4714735 | US4762890 | US4798081 | US4820590 | US4880682 | US4927888 | US4950541 | US5324576 | US5336545 | US5354597 | US5376430 | US5514470 | US5525257 | EP0490854 | US5814413 | US5824718 | US5919983 | WO9947339 | US6030917 | WO0105574 | US6211302 | US6248540 | US6268444 | US6284842 | US6306658 | US6316663 | US6362309 | US6395671 | US2002132923 | US2003004286 | WO03040195 | US6649548 | US2004010103 | US6709742 | WO2004024740 | WO2004063270 | US6803014 | WO2005090427 | - MARKOVICH, RONALD P.; HAZLITT, LONNIE G.; SMITH, LINLEY, "Development of gel-permeation chromatography-Fourier transform infrared spectroscopy for characterization of ethylene-based polyolefin copolymers", Polymeric Materials Science and Engineering, (19910000), vol. 65, pages 98 - 100 | - DESLAURIERS, P.J.; ROHLFING, D.C.; SHIEH, E.T., "Quantifying short chain branching microstructures in ethylene-1-olefin copolymers using size exclusion chromatography and Fourier transform infrared spectroscopy (SEC-FTIR", Polymer, (20020000), vol. 43, pages 59 - 170 | - WILLIAMS; WARD, J. Polym. Sci., Polym. Let., (19680000), vol. 6, page 621 | - WILDE, L.; RYIE, T.R.; KNOBELOCH, D.C.; PEAT, I.R., "Determination of Branching Distributions in Polyethylene and Ethylene Copolymers", J. Polym. Sci., (19820000), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1002/pol.1982.180200307, pages 441 - 455, XP000907677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1982.180200307 | - RANDALL, J.C., JMS-Rev. Macromol. Chem. Phys., (19890000), vol. C29, pages 201 - 317 | - N.J. TURRO et al., Ace. Chem. Res., (19720000), vol. 5, page 92 | - J.T. BANKS et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19930000), vol. 115, page 2473 | - S. WU, Polymer Engineering and Science, (19870000), vol. 27, page 335 | US20055662938 | US20030429024 | WO2005US08916 | WO2005US08915 | US20050662937 | US20050662939 | US20060376835 |