EP3570168 - DATA STORAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 1200 17th Street, Floor 15 Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2022/48] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, James c/o Palantir Technologies, Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA California 94301 / US | 02 /
Kruszewski, Robert c/o Palantir Technologies, Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA California 94301 / US | 03 /
Sanduleac, Ovidiu-Dan c/o Palantir Technologies, Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 300 Palo Alto CA California 94301 / US | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Sayer, Robert David Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 18188545.0 | 10.08.2018 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | GB20180007877 | 15.05.2018 Original published format: GB 201807877 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570168 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
G06F16/1756 (EP);
G06F16/2358 (US);
G06F16/2379 (US);
G06F16/273 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] |
Former [2019/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENSPEICHERSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/47] | English: | DATA STORAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/47] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 20.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2022 | 09.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/18] | 24.12.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5481722 (SKINNER GLENN [US]) [I] 1-15* column 3, line 59 - column 9, line 10 *; | [I]EP0981099 (CONNECTED PLACE LIMITED [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0035] *; | [I]US2014019698 (PITTELKO MICHAEL H [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0042] *; | [I] - LIU ET AL, "Maintaining large update batches by restructuring and grouping", INFORMATION SYST, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20070214), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.IS.2006.02.002, ISSN 0306-4379, pages 621 - 639, XP005891732 [I] 1-15 * page 626 - page 630 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.is.2006.02.002 |