EP3488857 - COMPOSITIONS OF GLP-1 PEPTIDES AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Tue Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
VILHELMSEN, Thomas Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
ELIASEN, Helle Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18188815.7 | 15.03.2013 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | EP20120160743 | 22.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12160743 | US201361748840P | 04.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361748840 P | EP20130153459 | 31.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13153459 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488857 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3488857 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3488857 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26, A61P3/10, A61K47/00 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61K47/06 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K9/2013 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/20, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/26, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON GLP-1-PEPTIDEN UND HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/22] | English: | COMPOSITIONS OF GLP-1 PEPTIDES AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [2019/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE PEPTIDES GLP-1 ET LEUR PRÉPARATION | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 29.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13709231.8 / EP2827885 | Divisional application(s) | EP23177173.4 / EP4324475 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2024
07.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 02
07.03.2024
08.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | 03
07.03.2024
08.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | 04
07.03.2024
08.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A. ul. Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 05
07.03.2024
08.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2024/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2024
07.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 22.03.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.07.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 07.06.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2024/08] | SM | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2006097537 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [X]US2009124639 (OYEWUMI MOSES [US], et al); | [XP]WO2012080471 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | by applicant | WO9319175 | WO9629342 | WO9630036 | WO9808871 | WO9943707 | WO9943706 | WO9943341 | WO9943708 | WO0046182 | WO0192206 | WO2005027978 | WO2005058954 | WO2005058958 | WO2006005667 | WO2006037810 | WO2006037811 | WO2006097537 | WO2006097538 | WO2007121318 | WO2008023050 | WO2008028859 | WO2009030738 | WO2009030771 | WO2009030774 | WO2009083549 | Opposition | WO2005107462 | WO2006084164 | WO2006124047 | WO2008003050 | WO2012080471 | WO2013189988 | WO2007146234 | WO2013139694 | EP3488857 | WO2006097537 | JP4585037B | WO2011094531 |