EP3610993 - SYSTEM FOR ACTIVE MOTION DISPLACEMENT CONTROL OF A ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, CA 92821 / US | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULMAYR, Günter Korbinian-Westermair-Strasse 21 85635 Höhenkirchen-Siegertsbrunn / DE | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
SCHULMAYR, Günther Korbinian-Westermair-Strasse 21 85635 Höhenkirchen-Siegertsbrunn / DE | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18188871.0 | 14.08.2018 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610993 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3610993 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
B25J9/1628 (EP,US);
B25J9/1664 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR AKTIVEN BEWEGUNGSVERSCHIEBUNGSSTEUERUNG EINES ROBOTERS | [2020/08] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ACTIVE MOTION DISPLACEMENT CONTROL OF A ROBOT | [2020/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE DÉPLACEMENT DE MOUVEMENT ACTIF D'UN ROBOT | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 18.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2024 | 09.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |