EP3611934 - PORTABLE AUDIO SYSTEM WITH ACOUSTIC WAVEGUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tymphany HK Limited Dominion Centre 43-59 Room 1307-8 Queen's Road East Wanchai Hong Kong / CN | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Kai-Li C/O TYMPHANY 10F, No.19-2, Sanchong Rd 11501 Taipei / TW | 02 /
THOMSON, James C/O TYMPHANY 10F, No.19-2, Sanchong Rd 11501 Taipei / TW | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 18189089.8 | 15.08.2018 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3611934 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/24, H04R1/20, G10K11/20, // H04R1/00, H04R1/02 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
G10K11/20 (EP);
H04R1/26 (EP);
H04R1/345 (EP);
H04R2201/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES AUDIOSYSTEM MIT AKUSTISCHEM WELLENLEITER | [2020/08] | English: | PORTABLE AUDIO SYSTEM WITH ACOUSTIC WAVEGUIDE | [2020/08] | French: | SYSTÈME AUDIO PORTABLE AVEC GUIDE D'ONDES ACOUSTIQUE | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 18.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO9007103 (OAKLEY RALPH WILLIAM [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,13 * page 2 - page 4; figure 5; claims 1-7 * [A] 5,11,12 [Y] 2,4,7-10,14,15; | [XY]US6064744 (AUGUSTIN HEINZ-JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1 * columns 1, 3; figure 1 * [Y] 9,10,15; | [YA]US9641919 (POOLE DAVID WILSON [US], et al) [Y] 2,4,7-10,14,15 * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 46; figures 2,3, 4 * * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 11 *[A] 5,6,11,12 | by applicant | US8130994 | US9549237 |