EP3444696 - ROTORCRAFT MULTIPLE PROFILE CAT-A GUIDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Textron Innovations Inc. 40 Westminster Street Providence, Rhode Island 02903 / US | [2020/45] |
Former [2019/08] | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. P.O. Box 482 Fort Worth, TX 76101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WORSHAM II, Robert Earl 305 Country Rd Weatherford, TX 76088 / US | 02 /
GILLETT, Luke Dafydd 706 E Wall St Grapevine, TX 76051 / US | 03 /
CAUDILL, Troy 6195 Oak Hollow Drive Burleson, TX 76028 / US | 04 /
REGNIER, Bradley Paul 1121 Albany Drive Ft. Worth, TX 76131 / US | 05 /
O'NEIL, Joshua Robert 604 Huntwich Dr. Bedford, TX 76021 / US | 06 /
THOMAS, Brandon Jeffrey 309 Willow St. Crowley, TX 76036 / US | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 18189205.0 | 15.08.2018 | [2019/08] | Priority number, date | US201762547002P | 17.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762547002 P | US201816032928 | 11.07.2018 Original published format: US201816032928 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3444696 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/06 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
G05D1/0669 (EP,US);
B64C19/00 (CN);
G05D1/0072 (US);
B64C13/16 (EP,US);
B64C13/503 (EP,US);
B64C13/506 (US);
B64C27/06 (CN);
B64C27/57 (EP,US);
B64D31/06 (EP,US);
G01C23/005 (EP,US);
G08G5/0021 (EP,US);
G08G5/0065 (EP,US);
B64D45/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHFLÜGLERMEHRFACHPROFILFÜHRUNG FÜR CAT A | [2019/08] | English: | ROTORCRAFT MULTIPLE PROFILE CAT-A GUIDANCE | [2019/08] | French: | GUIDE DE CAT-A DE GIRAVION À PROFILS MULTIPLES | [2019/08] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 13.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 23.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 28.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 28.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4420059 (LEUBNER HANS PETER [DE]); | [XI]US6527225 (SILDER JR STEPHEN H [US], et al); |