EP3611745 - GAS-INSULATED LOW- OR MEDIUM-VOLTAGE LOAD BREAK SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/47] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANJAN, Nitesh Parkweg 6 5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | 02 /
Carstensen, Jan Sudetenstrasse 18 79761 Waldshut/Tiengen / DE | 03 /
Bujotzek, Markus Immenweg 29 8050 Zurich / CH | 04 /
Over, Daniel Trottensteig 3 5313 Klingnau / CH | 05 /
Schwinne, Michael Neuwiesenstrasse 2 5420 Ehrendingen / CH | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18189231.6 | 16.08.2018 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3611745 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3611745 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/90, H01H33/70, // H01H33/12, H01H1/38, H01H3/46, H01H33/91 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H01H33/90 (EP);
H01H33/7023 (EP);
H01H33/7038 (EP);
H01H1/385 (EP);
H01H2033/566 (EP);
H01H3/46 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | H01H33/90, H01H33/70, H01H33/915, // H01H33/91, H01H1/38, H01H3/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASISOLIERTER LASTTRENNSCHALTER FÜR NIEDER- ODER MITTELSPANNUNG | [2020/08] | English: | GAS-INSULATED LOW- OR MEDIUM-VOLTAGE LOAD BREAK SWITCH | [2020/08] | French: | INTERRUPTEUR-SECTIONNEUR BASSE OU MOYENNE TENSION ISOLÉ PAR DU GAZ | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 19.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CH341209 (MICHAELIS FROBERT DIPL ING [DE]) [I] 1-15 * page 1, lines 1-9 * * page 2, line 105 - page 4, line 8; figures 4-8 *; | [XI]DE3743827 (SACHSENWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,10,12-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 52 * * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 5; figures 1, 2, 4 * * column 7, lines 9-40; figures 6-8 * [I] 2-4,7-9,11,15; | [XI]DE3803117 (SACHSENWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 52 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 68; figures 1-5 * [I] 2-4,7-9,11-15; | [I]DE3942568 (SACHSENWERK AG [DE]) [I] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-3 *; | [I]DE4003332 (SACHSENWERK AG [DE]) [I] 1-5,7-15 * abstract ** column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 65; figures 1-5 * | Examination | WO2017207763 | by applicant | CN105448589 |