EP3461364 - NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATKINSON, Antoine c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 02 /
OSBORN, Christopher c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 03 /
COURTNEY, Stephen c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2019/14] | Representative(s) | Mackisack, Anna Elizabeth, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2019/14] | Application number, filing date | 18190011.9 | 21.08.2018 | [2019/14] | Priority number, date | GB20170015816 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: GB 201715816 | [2019/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3461364 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A45D20/12 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
A45D20/122 (EP,US);
A45D20/12 (CN,GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜSE | [2019/14] | English: | NOZZLE | [2019/14] | French: | BUSE | [2019/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 01.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP3703110B (HITACHI MAXELL) [X] 1,2,9-13 * abstract * [I] 3-8; | [XI]WO2009081426 (TENACTA GROUP SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,9-13 * pages 3-7; figures 1-5 * [I] 3-8 |