EP3447166 - COATED CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tungaloy Corporation 11-1, Yoshima-Kogyodanchi Iwaki-shi Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishizawa, Hirosato c/o TUNGALOY CORPORATION 11-1, Yoshima-Kogyodanchi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | 02 /
Metoki, Kenji c/o TUNGALOY CORPORATION 11-1, Yoshima-Kogyodanchi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | [2021/20] |
Former [2019/09] | 01 /
Nishizawa, Hirosato c/o TUNGALOY CORPORATION 11-1, Yoshima-Kogyodanchi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | ||
02 /
Metoki, Kenji c/o TUNGALOY CORPORATION 11-1, Yoshima-Kogyodanchi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 18190159.6 | 22.08.2018 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | JP20170160981 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017160981 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447166 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3447166 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C30/00, C23C14/06, C04B35/5831, C04B35/645, C04B41/00, C04B41/52, C04B41/89, C23C14/02, C23C14/32 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C23C14/325 (EP,US);
B23B27/148 (US);
B28B11/04 (US);
B28B11/243 (US);
C04B35/5831 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
C04B41/00 (US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C23C14/022 (EP,US);
C23C14/0641 (EP,US);
C23C14/0647 (US);
C23C14/0664 (EP,US);
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
B23B2226/125 (US);
B23B2228/105 (US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3813 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3843 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3847 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3856 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3873 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3886 (EP,US);
C04B2235/402 (EP,US);
C04B2235/404 (EP,US);
C04B2235/405 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/5831 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4529, C04B41/5057, C04B41/5061, C04B41/5063, C04B41/5068 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4529, C04B41/5063, C04B41/5068 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | C23C30/00, C23C14/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETES SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [2019/09] | English: | COATED CUTTING TOOL | [2019/09] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE RECOUVERT | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 03.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2018 | AL | 19.05.2021 | AT | 19.05.2021 | CY | 19.05.2021 | CZ | 19.05.2021 | DK | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | ES | 19.05.2021 | FI | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MK | 19.05.2021 | NL | 19.05.2021 | PL | 19.05.2021 | RO | 19.05.2021 | RS | 19.05.2021 | SE | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | SM | 19.05.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | NO | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IE | 22.08.2021 | LU | 22.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | FR | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 22.08.2018 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IE | 22.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IE | 22.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IE | 22.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1918422 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE]) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0004] *; | [A]JP2016168669 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP6037255B (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP) [A] 1-7; | [AP]EP3269478 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-7 * examples 19, 24; table 14 * * example 49; claim 1; table 27 *; | [AP]US2018135168 (PASEUTH ANONGSACK [JP], et al) [AP] 1-7 * paragraph [0003] * | by applicant | JP2009255282 |