EP3613811 - METAL EFFECT PIGMENTS WITH CHAMPAGNE HUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlenk Metallic Pigments GmbH Barnsdorfer Hauptstrasse 5 91154 Roth / DE | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binder, Yvonne Kiefernweg 23 91186 Büchenbach / DE | 02 /
Huber, Adalbert Bonhoefferstrasse 9 64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Graser, Daniel Wilhelm-Dümmler-Str. 23 91126 Schwabach / DE | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18190262.8 | 22.08.2018 | [2020/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613811 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C09D5/36, C09D11/037, A61K8/02 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
C09C1/0066 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/0262 (EP,KR);
A61K8/0266 (US);
A61K8/19 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,KR,US);
C03C1/04 (US);
C09C1/0009 (US);
C09C1/0075 (US);
C09D1/00 (EP,KR);
C09D11/037 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,KR);
C09D11/50 (US);
C09D5/36 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,KR);
C09D7/62 (US);
C09D7/70 (US);
A61K2800/413 (US);
A61K2800/43 (US);
A61K2800/436 (EP,KR);
A61K2800/621 (EP,KR);
A61K2800/63 (US);
A61K2800/651 (US);
C09C2200/1058 (EP,US);
C09C2200/301 (EP,KR,US);
C09C2200/302 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHAMPAGNER-FARBTON METALLEFFEKTPIGMENTE | [2020/09] | English: | METAL EFFECT PIGMENTS WITH CHAMPAGNE HUE | [2020/09] | French: | PIGMENTS À EFFET MÉTALLIQUE DE TONALITÉ DE CHAMPAGNE | [2020/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007104663 (HENGLEIN FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-28 *; | [A]WO2007093334 (ECKART GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* claims 1, 5, 9, 10 *; | [XAY]EP3081601 (SCHLENK METALLIC PIGMENTS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * claims 1-11 * [A] 6 [Y] 7,8; | [XAY]EP3345974 (SCHLENK METALLIC PIGMENTS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * claims 1-15 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] - [0031] , [0040] - [0053] * * example 1 * [A] 6 [Y] 7,8 | by applicant | WO9622336 | EP0950693 | CA2496126 | DE19520312 | WO2007093334 | US7828890 | WO2011085780 | EP2303969 | WO2013175339 | WO2015014484 | WO2015040537 | EP2999752 | - "Spezielle Aluminiumpigmente in Kapitel 2 - Farbige Aluminiumpigmente", PETER WIßLING et al., Metalleffekt-Pigmente, Vincentz-Verlag, pages 70 - 76 | - LISA GHELARDI; ILARIA DEGANO; MARIA PERLA COLOMBINI; JOY MAZUREK; MICHAEL SCHILLING; HERANT KHANJIAN; TOM LEARNER, "A multi-analytical study on the photochemical degradation of synthetic organic pigments", Dyes and Pigments, (20150000), vol. 123, doi:doi:10.1016/j.dyepig.2015.07.029, pages 396 - 403, XP029346832 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dyepig.2015.07.029 |