Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3943430 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18190445 | 23.08.2018 | EP21191916 | 23.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12077411 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2024 | B2 | US2020062541 | 27.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18190445 | 23.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110857198B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2023 | B | CN110857198 | 03.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18190445 | 23.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3613690 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2021 | B1 | EP3613690 | 26.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18190445 | 23.08.2018 | Type | Divisional application | EP3943430 |