EP3578220 - OXYGEN CONCENTRATOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inova Labs, Inc. 7581 Convoy Court San Diego, CA 92111 / US | [2022/01] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Inova Labs, Inc. 3500 Comsouth Drive Suite 100 Austin, TX 78744 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKINSON, William R. 700 Deertrail Dr. San Marcos, TX 78666 / US | 02 /
NEBRIGIC, Dragan 226 Vailco Lane Austin, TX 78738 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18191040.7 | 14.10.2013 | [2019/50] | Priority number, date | US201261713254P | 12.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261713254 P | US201361804369P | 22.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361804369 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578220 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3578220 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/10, B01D53/047 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
A61M16/101 (EP,US);
A61M16/0672 (EP,US);
B01D53/0407 (US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
A61M16/1055 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0033 (EP,US);
A61M2016/1025 (EP,US);
A61M2230/42 (US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D2257/91 (EP,US);
B01D2258/06 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40009 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40098 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4533 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4541 (EP,US);
B01D2259/80 (EP,US);
B01D53/0438 (EP,US);
B01D53/0446 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | SAUERSTOFFKONZENTRATORSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/50] | English: | OXYGEN CONCENTRATOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2019/50] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONCENTRATEUR D'OXYGÈNE | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 17.04.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 27.06.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13844697.6 / EP2906280 | Divisional application(s) | EP23174676.9 / EP4249104 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | MC | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | GB | 14.10.2023 | LU | 14.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
GB | 14.10.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
GB | 14.10.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6346139 (CZABALA MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 12-15,26 * column 10, line 31 - column 11, line 25; figures 7,8 *; | [A]WO2004065293 (MULLINAX PHILLIP [US]) [A] 12-15,26 * abstract *; | [A]US2010071698 (KIRITAKE HISASHI [JP]) [A] 12-15,26* abstract *; | [A]US2011030685 (WILKINSON WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 12-15,26 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2012033839 (INOVA LABS INC [US], et al) [X] 12,13 * abstract * [I] 14,15 | by applicant | US2009065007 |