EP3449816 - MEDICAL SYSTEM COMPRISING A PATCH FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY SENSING ECG SIGNALS AND IMPEDANCE-INDICATIVE ELECTRICAL SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/10] | A MEDICAL PATCH FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY SENSING ECG SIGNALS AND IMPEDANCE-INDICATIVE ELECTRICAL SIGNALS | ||
[2022/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOVARI, Assaf c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/44] |
Former [2019/10] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18191160.3 | 28.08.2018 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | US201715689177 | 29.08.2017 Original published format: US201715689177 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3449816 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3449816 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/276, A61B5/30, A61B5/00 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
A61B5/6833 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/053 (IL,US);
A61B5/25 (CN,US);
A61B5/0538 (CN);
A61B5/063 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/276 (EP,US);
A61B5/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (US);
A61B5/6843 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | A61B5/00, A61B5/0424, A61B5/0428 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM MIT EINEM PATCH ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN ERFASSUNG VON ECG-SIGNALEN UND IMPEDANZANZEIGENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN SIGNALEN | [2022/47] | English: | MEDICAL SYSTEM COMPRISING A PATCH FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY SENSING ECG SIGNALS AND IMPEDANCE-INDICATIVE ELECTRICAL SIGNALS | [2022/47] | French: | SYSTÈME MÉDICAL AVEC TIMBRE PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER SIMULTANÉMENT DES SIGNAUX D'ECG ET DES SIGNAUX ÉLECTRIQUES INDICATEURS D'IMPÉDANCE | [2022/47] |
Former [2019/10] | MEDIZINISCHES PATCH ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN ERFASSUNG VON ECG-SIGNALEN UND IMPEDANZANZEIGENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN SIGNALEN | ||
Former [2019/10] | A MEDICAL PATCH FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY SENSING ECG SIGNALS AND IMPEDANCE-INDICATIVE ELECTRICAL SIGNALS | ||
Former [2019/10] | TIMBRE MÉDICAL PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER SIMULTANÉMENT DES SIGNAUX D'ECG ET DES SIGNAUX ÉLECTRIQUES INDICATEURS D'IMPÉDANCE | Examination procedure | 06.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 06.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003078510 (OLSON DANA J [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 23] , [0 24] , [0 31] - [0033] *; | [Y]US2006020218 (FREEMAN WARWICK [AU], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0019] - [0022] *; | [XI]US2006030781 (SHENNIB ADNAN [US]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * paragraphs [0040] , [0055]; figure 1 * [I] 2-4,7-9; | [X]US2010286607 (SALTZSTEIN WILLIAM E [US]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * paragraphs [0046] , [0054] *; | [Y]EP3181046 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [Y] 1-12* paragraphs [0019] , [0042] , [0047] , [0049]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US2009318793 | US2012165644 | US8456182 | US2014094707 | US2015141798 |