EP3617953 - AN ADAPTABLE NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEBRE, Binyam Gebrekidan c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
TRAJANOVSKI, Stojan c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18191736.0 | 30.08.2018 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3617953 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G06N3/082 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSBARES NEURONALES NETZWERK | [2020/10] | English: | AN ADAPTABLE NEURAL NETWORK | [2020/10] | French: | RÉSEAU NEURONAL ADAPTABLE | [2020/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018081563 (GOOGLE LLC [US]) [X] 1-5,10-13,15 * page 2, line 20 - page 10, line 16 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 6-9,14; | [A]EP3361421 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0047] ** figures 1-7 * | by applicant | - HUANG, G.; LIU, Z.; WEINBERGER, K.Q.; VAN DER MAATEN, L., "Densely connected convolutional networks", Proceedings of the IEEE conference on computer vision and pattern recognition, (20170700), vol. 1, no. 2, page 3 |