EP3454292 - IMAGE PROCESS METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Shinichi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo, 192-8507 / JP | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18191769.1 | 30.08.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | JP20170171076 | 06.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017171076 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454292 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/20 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
G06T1/20 (EP,US);
G02B21/367 (US);
G02B21/0076 (US);
G02B21/361 (US);
G06F2218/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDPROZESSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2019/11] | English: | IMAGE PROCESS METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2019/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET PROGRAMME | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - Autoquant Imaging Inc, "Tutorials for Deconvolution Menu Items Deconvolution Settings", Manual and Tutorials, (20040301), pages 133 - 166, URL: https://biochimie.umontreal.ca/wp-content/uploads/sites/37/2012/08/Autodeblur_User_Manual.pdf, (20190121), XP055545421 [X] 1,3-6,8-10 * page 145 * * page 148 * * page 151 * * page 157 * * page 165 * [I] 2,7 | [A] - David S.C. Biggs, "3D Deconvolution Microscopy", Current Protocols in Cytometry, Hoboken, NJ, USA, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., (20100401), doi:10.1002/0471142956.cy1219s52, ISBN 978-0-47-114295-9, XP055030709 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471142956.cy1219s52 | by applicant | US2016062100 |