EP3453973 - FUEL SPRAY NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK, PT | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2019/11] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tentorio, Luca c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Muldal, Carl c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 03 /
Huang, Hua Wei c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 04 /
Bacharoudis, Evangelos c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 05 /
Roman Casado, Juan Carlos c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18191781.6 | 30.08.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | GR20170100411 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: GR 20170100411 | GB20170016585 | 10.10.2017 Original published format: GB 201716585 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453973 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453973 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/14, F23R3/28, F23D11/10, F23D11/38 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
F23R3/286 (EP,US);
F23R3/30 (US);
F23D11/107 (EP,US);
F23D11/383 (EP,US);
F23R3/14 (EP,US);
F05D2210/11 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | F23R3/14, F23R3/28, F23D11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFSPRÜHDÜSE | [2019/11] | English: | FUEL SPRAY NOZZLE | [2019/11] | French: | BUSE DE PULVÉRISATION DE CARBURANT | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 13.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2018 | AL | 12.08.2020 | AT | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | ES | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | IT | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | NL | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | TR | 12.08.2020 | IE | 30.08.2020 | LU | 30.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.08.2018 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
TR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0678708 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-7,10-14 * column 3, line 7 - line 33 *; | [X]US6068470 (ZARZALIS NIKOLAOS [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,10-14 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 24; figure 1 *; | [X]US6460344 (STEINTHORSSON ERLENDUR [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-14 * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 37; figure 4 *; | [XI]EP1331441 (NAT AEROSPACE LAB [JP]) [X] 1-7,10-14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0019] * [I] 8,9,15; | [X]EP1584872 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,10-14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1750056 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-7,10-14* paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035]; figures 3,4 * |