EP3450691 - TURBINE ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEON, Jeffrey 234 Georgetown Drive Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US | 02 /
INDOE, William 60 Richard Street West Hartford, CT Connecticut 06119 / US | 03 /
CARUSO, Kimberly 24 Park Place Apt. 24B Hartford, CT Connecticut 06106 / US | 04 /
BURKE, Brian J. 76 Wentworth Drive South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US | 05 /
BETANCOURT, Fabian D. 220 Northfield Road Meriden, CT Connecticut 06450 / US | 06 /
LEACH, Kurt 18 Pepperbush Drive Amston, CT Connecticut 06231 / US | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18192199.0 | 03.09.2018 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | US201715694488 | 01.09.2017 Original published format: US201715694488 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450691 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30, // F01D11/00 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
F01D5/3015 (EP,US);
F01D5/02 (US);
F01D5/3007 (US);
F01D11/001 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBINENROTOR | [2019/10] | English: | TURBINE ROTOR | [2019/10] | French: | ROTOR DE TURBINE | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 06.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0222679 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,10-14 * figure 1 *[I] 15; | [XI]EP0475879 (PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA [CA]) [X] 1-6,14 * figure 4 * [I] 7-13,15; | [XI]WO2012092223 (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13 * figures 3,5 * [I] 8,9,15; | [XI]US2014056713 (TOMEO PETER V [US], et al) [X] 1-6,14 * paragraph [0026]; figures 1,3 * * abstract * [I] 7-13,15 |