Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
02.10.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.09.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.04.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.04.2021 | First examination report | |
02.10.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.09.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
20.09.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
20.09.2019 | Change - designated states | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.02.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
05.09.2018 | Change - representative |