Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10294630 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2019 | B2 | US2019071841 | 07.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715696256 | 06.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3453802 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715696256 | 06.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102018068137 | 24.03.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201715696256 | 06.09.2017 |