EP3444160 - A VEHICLE DRIVER FEEDBACK SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Truck Corporation 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/29] |
Former [2019/08] | For all designated states Volvo Truck Corporation 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKAGIUS, Adam Skepparegången 30 413 18 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
LÖWGREN, Fredrik Murarstigen 23 144 33 Rönninge / SE | 03 /
ERIKSSON, Anders Soldatvägen 2 423 49 Torslanda / SE | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2022/29] |
Former [2019/08] | Volvo Technology Corporation Volvo Group Intellectual Property BF14100, VGHQ3A 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 18192878.9 | 28.01.2014 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3444160 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3444160 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/14 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
G09B9/042 (US);
B60K35/00 (US);
B60K35/28 (EP,US);
G07C5/06 (US);
G09B5/02 (US);
B60K2360/174 (EP,US);
B60W2050/146 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2520/105 (EP,US);
B60W2520/125 (EP,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,US);
B60W2554/801 (EP,US);
B60W2556/10 (EP,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] |
Former [2019/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRERRÜCKMELDESYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2019/08] | English: | A VEHICLE DRIVER FEEDBACK SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2019/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉTROACTION DE CONDUCTEUR DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2019/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 20.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14702446.7 / EP3099552 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.07.2022 | AT | 20.07.2022 | CZ | 20.07.2022 | DK | 20.07.2022 | EE | 20.07.2022 | ES | 20.07.2022 | FI | 20.07.2022 | HR | 20.07.2022 | IT | 20.07.2022 | LT | 20.07.2022 | LV | 20.07.2022 | MC | 20.07.2022 | NL | 20.07.2022 | PL | 20.07.2022 | RO | 20.07.2022 | RS | 20.07.2022 | SE | 20.07.2022 | SI | 20.07.2022 | SK | 20.07.2022 | SM | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.10.2022 | GR | 21.10.2022 | IS | 20.11.2022 | PT | 21.11.2022 | GB | 28.01.2023 | IE | 28.01.2023 | LU | 28.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
GB | 28.01.2023 | ||
IE | 28.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
GB | 28.01.2023 | ||
IE | 28.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
GB | 28.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
GB | 28.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 20.07.2022 | |
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 20.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004108466 (VOLVO TECHNOLOGY CORP [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0073]; figures 2,3,8c *; | [Y]WO2006001809 (FORD MOTOR CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008036014 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [Y] 5,12 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2008127465 (NEC LAB AMERICA INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * pages 4-9; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2010030413 (JINNO KUNIHIKO [JP]) [Y] 5,12 * figure 7 *; | [A]EP2375385 (PROZESS CONTROL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE102010054077 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012179346 (ALDIGHIERI PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 3,10 * figure 4 *; | [Y]CA2735458 (HUGRON DENIS [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [Y]DE102012004432 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004108466 | WO2006001809 | US2007001831 | DE102012004432 |