Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3770460 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2022 | B1 | EP3770460 | 27.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18193169 | 07.09.2018 | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107630973B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2024 | B | CN107630973 | 26.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107606052B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2024 | B | CN107606052 | 19.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3770460T | 09.01.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP18193169 | 07.09.2018 | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10677311 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2020 | B2 | US2019085932 | 21.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3462053 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2020 | B1 | EP3462053 | 03.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3462053T | 07.12.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2840223T | 06.07.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2935263T | 03.03.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CN201710855034 | 20.09.2017 | CN201710853726 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP3770460 |