EP3449869 - IMPLANT PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nobel Biocare Services AG Balz-Zimmermann-Strasse 7 8302 Kloten / CH | [2021/24] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Zipprich, Holger Bleichweg 7a 64342 Malchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIPPRICH, Holger Bleichweg 7a 64342 Malchen / DE | [2023/07] |
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Capré, Didier Nobel Biocare Services AG Intellectual Property Department Balz-Zimmermann-Strasse 7 8302 Kloten / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2019/10] | Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 18193357.3 | 31.01.2012 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | DE20111009906 | 31.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011009906 | [2019/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3449869 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3449869 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
A61C8/006 (EP,CN,US);
A61C8/005 (EP,CN,US);
A61C8/0022 (US);
A61C8/0037 (US);
A61C8/0068 (EP,CN,US);
A61C8/0069 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IMPLANTAT-TEIL | [2019/10] | English: | IMPLANT PART | [2019/10] | French: | PARTIE D'IMPLANT | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 06.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12706189.3 / EP2670339 | EP14198376.7 / EP2865354 | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 28.09.2023 | |
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0226154 (BIOLOK INT INC [US]) [A] 1-6* page 8, paragraph 1; figures 8, 9 *; | [XA]WO2004073541 (SCHROEDER RALF [DE]) [X] 7 * page 3, lines 12-26; figure 1 * * page 18, line 20 - page 19, line 28 * [A] 1-6; | [XA]WO2006109176 (BTI I & D S L [ES], et al) [X] 7 * page 11, lines 4-35; figures 7, 8 * [A] 1-6; | [XA]DE102006036020 (BORRMANN IGOR [DE], et al) [X] 7 * paragraphs [0032] - [0034]; figure 4 * [A] 1-6; | [XDA]DE102008054138 (ZIPPRICH HOLGER [DE]) [XD] 7 * figure - * [A] 1-6 |