|
02.05.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2023 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2023 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2023 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
20.01.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2019 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2019 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
(Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Deficiencies in application documents - annex C |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |