30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
03.05.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
24.06.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
26.05.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
24.05.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.01.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2023 |
Change - inventor |
|
13.01.2023 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
14.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.07.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.09.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.05.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
05.03.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.06.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.04.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2019 |
First examination report |
|
10.12.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.09.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.09.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
11.09.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.02.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
28.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2018 |
Change - representative |
|