EP3454095 - OPTOELECTRONIC SENSOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2020/08] |
Former [2019/11] | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch/Breisgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBRECHT, Roland Alemannenstr. 13 79211 Denzlingen / DE | 02 /
EBLE, Johannes Am Rosengarten 28 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 03 /
KRIENER, Eva-Maria Sickingenstr. 41c 79117 Freiburg / DE | [2020/17] |
Former [2019/11] | 01 /
Albrecht, Roland Alemannenstr. 13 79211 Denzlingen / DE | ||
02 /
Eble, Johannes Am Rosengarten 28 79183 Waldkirch / DE | |||
03 /
Kriener, Eva-Maria Sickingenstr. 41c 79117 Freiburg / DE | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/36] |
Former [2019/11] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18193414.2 | 10.09.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | DE201710120877 | 11.09.2017 Original published format: DE102017120877 | [2019/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454095 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3454095 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/12 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
G01V8/12 (EP,US);
G01V8/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHES SENSORSYSTEM | [2019/11] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC SENSOR SYSTEM | [2019/11] | French: | SYSTÈME CAPTEUR OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 04.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2018 | AL | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | DK | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | ES | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | MT | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | TR | 02.09.2020 | IE | 10.09.2020 | LU | 10.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/33] | HU | 10.09.2018 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
MT | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 10.09.2020 | ||
LU | 10.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.09.2018 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MT | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 10.09.2020 | ||
LU | 10.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
IE | 10.09.2020 | ||
LU | 10.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 10.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 10.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 10.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 10.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1275913 (SICK ERWIN) [A] 11 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0170008 (ELESTA AG ELEKTRONIK [CH]) [A] 1,10 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0527326 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 9* abstract *; | [A]US2002135748 (LAPOLICE GEORGE D [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [I]DE20023839U (IFM ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-12 * figures 1,6 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] *; | [A]DE102005013317 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0009]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2226653 (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 11 * paragraph [0011]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE202009007612U (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE202014009924U (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP3104198 (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 4 * |