EP3457131 - BLOOD TESTING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C A Casyso GmbH St. Jakobs-Strasse 17 4052 Basel / CH | [2024/07] |
Former [2019/12] | For all designated states C A Casyso GmbH St. Jakobs-Strasse 17 4052 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCLUSKEY, Cory Lee 266 Rodney Avenue Encinitas, CA California 92024 / US | 02 /
HILLMAN, Robert S. 4963 Hidden Dune Court San Diego, CA California 92130 / US | 03 /
GORIN, Michael P.O. Box 3505 Incline Village, NV Nevada 89450 / US | 04 /
SCHWAIGER, Hubert Martin Breisacher Str. 17/3 81667 München / DE | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2019/12] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18193752.5 | 29.09.2015 | [2019/12] | Priority number, date | US201414500248 | 29.09.2014 Original published format: US201414500248 | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3457131 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3457131 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3457131 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, G01N33/86 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/4905 (EP,US);
B01L3/502 (US);
B01L3/561 (US);
B01L3/567 (US);
G01N11/00 (US);
G01N33/86 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0621 (US);
B01L2200/0684 (US);
B01L2200/10 (US);
B01L2300/0627 (US);
B01L2300/087 (US);
B01L2400/049 (US);
B01L2400/0694 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BLUTTESTSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/12] | English: | BLOOD TESTING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TESTS SANGUINS | [2019/12] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15187347.8 / EP3001196 | Divisional application(s) | EP24157405.2 / EP4345457 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4752449 (JACKSON JACQUELINE J [US], et al); | [A]US2005233460 (CLAGUE CYNTHIA T [US], et al); | [X]US2008261261 (GRIMES CRAIG A [US], et al); | [A]US2010184201 (SCHUBERT AXEL [DE], et al); | [XA]US2011252352 (VIOLA FRANCESCO [US], et al); | [XA]US2012294767 (VIOLA FRANCESCO [US], et al); | [A]DE202014002289U (CORAMED TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) |