EP3434161 - A FIXATION DEVICE FOR A SHOWER DOOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattsson, Martin Blomstervägen 7 375 34 Mörrum / SE | 02 /
Nilsson, Patrik Gullregnsvägen 3 375 31 Mörrum / SE | 03 /
Randle, Ian 198 Crowmere Road Shrewsbury, Shropshire, SY2 5LD / GB | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18194082.6 | 06.10.2014 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3434161 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/30 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
A47K3/30 (EP);
F16B37/0821 (EP);
F16B37/0857 (EP);
F16B7/0433 (EP);
F16B7/187 (EP);
A47K2003/307 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] |
Former [2019/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FIXIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN DUSCHTÜRSYSTEM | [2019/05] | English: | A FIXATION DEVICE FOR A SHOWER DOOR SYSTEM | [2019/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION POUR UN SYSTÈME DE PORTE DE DOUCHE | [2019/05] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 30.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/38] | 16.08.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.11.2021 | 04.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14187815.7 / EP3005919 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3553891 (CASEBOLT RALPH T, et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * column 1, lines 55-59 * * column 2, lines 11-15, 49-59 * * column 3, lines 35-58 ** figures 1, 2; claims 1, 5, 6 *; | [XI]EP0441010 (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * [I] 3; | [X]US5205102 (PLUMMER DAVID D [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * figures 2-5 * |