EP3461145 - SPEAKER TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Frank c/o Harman International Industries, Incorporated 125, Fangzhou Road 215024 Suzhou, Jiangsu / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Sum 703, 9-4 Building Neima Road Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Bo c/o Harman International Industries, Incorporated 125, Fangzhou Road 215024 Suzhou, Jiangsu / CN | [2019/18] |
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
LI, Frank 1555 Tongda Road Suzhou, Jiangsu 215124 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Sum 703, 9-4 Building Neima Road Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | |||
03 /
SUN, Bo 88, XingHan Street Sijxinjayu Suzhou, Jiangsu 215124 / CN | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2022/25] |
Former [2019/13] | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18194144.4 | 13.09.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | US201715715347 | 26.09.2017 Original published format: US201715715347 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3461145 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3461145 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/06, H04R9/04 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
H04R1/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04R9/025 (CN);
H04R9/02 (US);
H04R1/025 (KR);
H04R9/043 (US);
H04R9/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04R31/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LAUTSPRECHERANSCHLÜSSE | [2019/13] | English: | SPEAKER TERMINALS | [2019/13] | French: | TERMINAUX DE HAUT-PARLEUR | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 06.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 19.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2018 | AL | 22.06.2022 | AT | 22.06.2022 | CY | 22.06.2022 | CZ | 22.06.2022 | DK | 22.06.2022 | EE | 22.06.2022 | ES | 22.06.2022 | FI | 22.06.2022 | HR | 22.06.2022 | IT | 22.06.2022 | LT | 22.06.2022 | LV | 22.06.2022 | MC | 22.06.2022 | MK | 22.06.2022 | MT | 22.06.2022 | NL | 22.06.2022 | PL | 22.06.2022 | RO | 22.06.2022 | RS | 22.06.2022 | SE | 22.06.2022 | SI | 22.06.2022 | SK | 22.06.2022 | SM | 22.06.2022 | IE | 13.09.2022 | LU | 13.09.2022 | BG | 22.09.2022 | NO | 22.09.2022 | GR | 23.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | FR | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | IS | 22.10.2022 | PT | 24.10.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 13.09.2018 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CY | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
MK | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 13.09.2018 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CY | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.09.2018 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0720415 (KENWOOD CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,9,13 * figure a * * column 9, lines 3-18 * * column 14, lines 25-47 ** figures 1,8,9 *; | [A]US6633649 (HONNERT MATTHEW L [US], et al) [A] 1,6,8,13 * abstract * * column 4, lines 8-25 * * figures 7,8 *; | [XAI]US2008080736 (SUMITANI YOICHIRO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [[0023]] , [[0030]] * * paragraphs [[0040]] , [[0042]] * * figures 1,3,7,8c * [A] 5,12,15 [I] 9,11,14; | [A]US2016227325 (PARE CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [A] 1,6,9,13 * abstract * * paragraph [[0055]] * * figure 2A * |