EP3624283 - PROTECTING ELONGATED ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGTMEIER, Gereon c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18194187.3 | 13.09.2018 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624283 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
H02G3/0475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZ VON LÄNGLICHEN ELEMENTEN | [2020/12] | English: | PROTECTING ELONGATED ELEMENTS | [2020/12] | French: | PROTECTION D'ÉLÉMENTS ALLONGÉS | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6408888 (BAEUMER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,11,12,14,15 * figures 1, 11, 13 * * column 1, lines 31,32 * * column 2, lines 4-7 * * column 3, lines 22-40 * * column 7, lines 53,56 * * column 8, lines 38,-47, 53-55, 59-65 * [Y] 7; | [Y]US2008092974 (GLEESON MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 7 * figures 1, 3, 4a, 4b * * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] *; | [Y]US2008121407 (KASSAB DOROTHY [US]) [Y] 7 * figures 2, 7 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 18] , [0 38] *; | [A]US5824957 (HOLSHAUSEN NICHOLAS HUGO [ZA]) [A] 1-7,11,12,14,15 * figures 8, 9, 15-18 * * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 21 *; | [A]DE102009029957 (RUETTIGER MAXIMILIAN [DE]) [A] 1-7,11,12,14,15 * figure 6 *; | [A]FR2596492 (PLASTAG SA [CH]) [A] 1-7,11,12,14,15 * figures 1-8 * * page 4, line 13 - line 19 * * page 7, line 13 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0197546 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO [JP]) [A] 1-7,11,12,14,15 * figures 6, 7, 46 * * column 17, line 22 - line 27 * * column 10, line 31 - line 48 * | by applicant | US2016149385 |