EP3624067 - TOLLING STATION FOR TOLLING VEHICLES OF DIFFERENT CLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kapsch TrafficCom AG Am Europlatz 2 1120 Wien / AT | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Björn, CRONA Humlegården 19 553 38 Jönköping / SE | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Weiser & Voith Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Kopfgasse 7 1130 Wien / AT | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18194462.0 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624067 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3624067 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/06 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
G07B15/06 (EP);
G07B15/063 (US);
G06V20/52 (US);
G08G1/015 (US);
H04W4/44 (US);
G06V20/625 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Title | German: | MAUTSTELLE FÜR MAUTPFLICHTIGE FAHRZEUGE VERSCHIEDENER KLASSEN | [2020/12] | English: | TOLLING STATION FOR TOLLING VEHICLES OF DIFFERENT CLASSES | [2020/12] | French: | STATION DE PÉAGE POUR VÉHICULES DE DIFFÉRENTES CLASSES | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 06.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2018 | AL | 30.12.2020 | CY | 30.12.2020 | CZ | 30.12.2020 | DK | 30.12.2020 | EE | 30.12.2020 | FI | 30.12.2020 | HR | 30.12.2020 | IT | 30.12.2020 | LT | 30.12.2020 | LV | 30.12.2020 | MC | 30.12.2020 | MK | 30.12.2020 | NL | 30.12.2020 | PL | 30.12.2020 | RO | 30.12.2020 | RS | 30.12.2020 | SI | 30.12.2020 | SK | 30.12.2020 | SM | 30.12.2020 | BG | 30.03.2021 | NO | 30.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | IS | 30.04.2021 | PT | 30.04.2021 | IE | 14.09.2021 | LU | 14.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 14.09.2018 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.09.2021 | ||
LU | 14.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.09.2021 | ||
LU | 14.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.09.2021 | ||
LU | 14.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.09.2021 | ||
LU | 14.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.09.2021 | ||
LU | 14.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
LU | 14.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9607168 (AT COMM INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 5, line 20 - line l * * page 9, line 4 - page 14, line 8 * * page 43, line 2 - line 6 * * figures 1,10 *; | [A]EP0928473 (COMBITECH TRAFFIC SYST AB [SE]) [A] 1,5,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6140941 (DWYER DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 31 * * column 3, line 29 - line 38 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 38 * * figures 1,2a,4a *; | [A]US7324015 (ALLEN JIM [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 27 - line 36 * * column 9, line 1 - column 20, line 50 * * figures 1-5,16, 26 *; | [A]US2015070501 (OOI TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 5a * |