EP3460352 - BOILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.C.I. Caldaie S.p.A. Via Giovanni Pascoli 38 Frazione Campagnola 37059 Zevio / IT | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PISANI, Giovanni VIA SOTTOCASTELLO, 76/E 37142 VERONA / IT | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 18194990.0 | 18.09.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | IT20170106691 | 25.09.2017 Original published format: IT201700106691 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460352 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/24, F24H1/28, F23D14/62 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
F24H1/186 (EP,US);
F23D14/02 (EP,CN,US);
F23D14/46 (CN);
F23D14/62 (EP,CN,US);
F23L17/005 (EP,US);
F23L5/02 (US);
F23N3/005 (EP,US);
F24H1/205 (EP,US);
F24H1/24 (EP,US);
F24H1/285 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KESSEL | [2019/13] | English: | BOILER | [2019/13] | French: | CHAUDIÈRE | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 25.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2314448 (VIDALENQ MAURICE [FR]) [X] 1-4 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5; | [Y]US4204832 (MILLER ROBERT F [US]) [Y] 5 * column 1; figure 1 *; | [X]US4993402 (RIPKA CHESTER D [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 3 - column 5; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1052461 (STATE IND INC [US]) [A] 1-4* the whole document * |