EP3456813 - ENTEROCOCCUS FAECALIS STRAINS FOR PRODUCTION OF MONOCLONAL PHAGE PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instytut Biochemii I Biofizyki Polskiej Akademii Nauk Pawinskiego 5A 02-106 Warszawa / PL | For all designated states Instytut Immunologii i Terapii Doswiadczalnej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Ul. Rudolfa Weigla 12 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lobocka, Malgorzata Polnej Rózy 6/13 02-798 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
Gozdek, Agnieszka Czerniakowska 22/45 00-714 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
Izak, Dariusz PCK 10 05-803 Pruszków / PL | 04 /
Zalewska, Agnieszka Filipiny Plaskowickiej 46/19 02-778 Warszawa / PL | 05 /
Gawor, Jan Grochowska 202/107 04-357 Warszawa / PL | 06 /
Dabrowski, Kamil Lukasinskiego 108/1 05-071 Sulejówek / PL | 07 /
Gromadka, Robert Przy Agorze 3/90 01-960 Warszawa / PL | 08 /
Weber-Dabrowska, Beata Pugeta 12 51-628 Wroclaw / PL | 09 /
Górski, Andrzej Pasaz Ursynowski 3/1 02-784 Warszawa / PL | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Witek, Rafal WTS Patent Attorneys Witek, Sniezko & Partners ul. Weigla 12 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 18195200.3 | 31.08.2015 | [2019/12] | Priority number, date | PL20140409332 | 31.08.2014 Original published format: PL 40933214 | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3456813 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3456813 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12N7/00, // C12R1/46 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12N2795/00051 (EP);
C12R2001/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] |
Former [2019/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENTEROCOCCUS-FAECALIS-STÄMME ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MONOKLONALEN PHAGENPRÄPARATEN | [2019/12] | English: | ENTEROCOCCUS FAECALIS STRAINS FOR PRODUCTION OF MONOCLONAL PHAGE PREPARATIONS | [2019/12] | French: | SOUCHES D'ENTEROCOCCUS FAECALIS POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PRÉPARATIONS DE PHAGES MONOCLONAUX | [2019/12] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 20.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15778720.1 / EP3186361 | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2015 | AL | 28.04.2021 | AT | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | CZ | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | ES | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | IT | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | MT | 28.04.2021 | NL | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SE | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | TR | 28.04.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | IE | 31.08.2021 | LU | 31.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 31.08.2015 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
TR | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
IE | 31.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 31.08.2015 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
IE | 31.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 31.08.2015 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
IE | 31.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
IE | 31.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
IE | 31.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
IE | 31.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BOURGOGNE AGATHE ET AL, "Large scale variation in Enterococcus faecalis illustrated by the genome analysis of strain OG1RF", GENOME BIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20080708), vol. 9, no. 7, ISSN 1465-6906, page R110, XP021041654 [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page R110.4, column r, paragraph 1 * | [A] - M. FRITZENWANKER ET AL, "Complete Genome Sequence of the Probiotic Enterococcus faecalis Symbioflor 1 Clone DSM 16431", GENOME ANNOUNCEMENTS, (20130207), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1128/genomeA.00165-12, pages e00165 - 12, XP055233786 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/genomeA.00165-12 | [A] - MATOS RENATA C ET AL, "Enterococcus faecalis Prophage Dynamics and Contributions to Pathogenic Traits", PLOS GENETICS, (201306), vol. 9, no. 6, XP055233703 [A] 1-3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1003539 | [AD] - JUMPEI UCHIYAMA ET AL, "In silico and in vivo evaluation of bacteriophage OEF24C, a candidate for treatment of Enterococcusfaecalis infections", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 74, no. 13, doi:10.1128/AEM.02371-07, ISSN 0099-2240, (20080701), pages 4149 - 4163, (20080502), XP002633409 [AD] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02371-07 | [T] - FRIEDERIKE S. ROSSMANN ET AL, "Phage-mediated Dispersal of Biofilm and Distribution of Bacterial Virulence Genes Is Induced by Quorum Sensing", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20150223), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1004653, page e1004653, XP055233701 [T] * page 5, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1004653 | by applicant | - ARIAS CA; MURRAY BE, "The rise of the Enterococcus: beyond vancomycin resistance", Nat Rev Microbiol., (20120000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nrmicro2761, pages 266 - 278, XP002731857 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro2761 | - BALOGH, B.; JONES, J. B.; IRIARTE, F. B.; MOMOL, M. T., "Phage therapy for plant disease control", Curr. Pharm. Biotechnol., (20100000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.2174/138920110790725302, pages 48 - 57, XP055273957 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/138920110790725302 | - CANCHAYA C; PROUX C; FOURNOUS G; BRUTTIN A; BRUSSOW H, "Prophage genomics", Microbiol. Mol. Biol. Rev., (20030000), vol. 67, pages 238 - 276 | - CHEETHAM BF; KATZ ME, "A role for bacteriophages in the evolution and transfer of bacterial virulence determinants", Mol Microbiol., (19950000), vol. 18, pages 201 - 208 | - GILL, J.J.; HYMAN, P., "Phage choice, isolation, and preparation for phage therapy", Curr Pharm Biotechnol., (20100000), vol. 11, pages 2 - 14 | - GOLEC, P.; D BROWSKI, K.; HEJNOWICZ, M.S.; GOZDEK, A.; LOS, J.M.; W GRZYN, G.; LOBOCKA, M.B.; LOS, M., "A reliable method for storage of tailed phages", J Microbiol Methods, (20110000), vol. 84, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mimet.2011.01.007, pages 486 - 9, XP028149898 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mimet.2011.01.007 | - GOLKAR Z; BAGASRA O; PACE DG, "Bacteriophage therapy: a potential solution for the antibiotic resistance crisis", J Infect Dev Ctries, (20140000), vol. 8, pages 129 - 136 | - GORSKI A; MIEDZYBRODZKI R; BORYSOWSKI J; WEBER-DABROWSKA B; LOBOCKA M; FORTUNA W; LETKIEWICZ S; ZIMECKI M; FILBY G, "Bacteriophage therapy for the treatment of infections", Curr Opin Investig Drugs, (20090000), vol. 10, pages 766 - 774 | - GIRIDHARA UPADHYAYA PM; RAVIKUMAR KL; UMAPATHY BL, "Review of virulence factors of enterococcus: an emerging nosocomial pathogen", Indian J Med Microbiol., (20090000), vol. 27, pages 301 - 305 | - "Basic phage biology", GUTTMAN, B.; RAYA, P.; KUTTER, E., Bacteriophages: biology and application, CRC Press, (20050000), pages 29 - 66 | - LETKIEWICZ S; MIEDZYBRODZKI R; FORTUNA W; WEBER-DABROWSKA B; GORSKI A, "Eradication of Enterococcus faecalis by phage therapy in chronic bacterial prostatitis-case report", Folia Microbiol (Praha, (20090000), vol. 54, pages 457 - 461 | - "The first step to bacteriophage therapy - how to choose the correct phage. In.: Phage Therapy", LOBOCKA M.; HEJNOWICZ M. S.; GQGATA U.; WEBER-DABROWSKA B.; W GRZYN G.; DADLEZ M., Current Research and Applications, Academic Press, (20140000), pages 23 - 69 | - MATOS RC; LAPAQUE N; RIGOTTIER-GOIS L; DEBARBIEUX L; MEYLHEUC T; GONZALEZ-ZORN B; REPOILA F; LOPES MDE F; SERROR P, "Enterococcus faecalis prophage dynamics and contributions to pathogenic traits", PLoS Genet, (20130000), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pgen.1003539, page e1003539, XP055233703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1003539 | - MERABISHVILI, M.; PIRNAY, J.P.; VERBEKEN, G.; CHANISHVILI, N.; TEDIASHVILI, M.; LASHKHI, N.; GLONTI, T.; KRYLOV, V.; MAST, J.; VAN, "Quality-controlled small-scale production of a well-defined bacteriophage cocktail for use in human clinical trials", PLoS One, (20090000), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0004944, page e4944, XP002543299 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0004944 | - UCHIYAMA J; RASHEL M; TAKEMURA I; WAKIGUCHI H; MATSUZAKI S, "In silico and in vivo evaluation of bacteriophage phiEF24C, a candidate for treatment of Enterococcus faecalis infections", Appl Environ Microbiol., (20080000), vol. 74, pages 4149 - 4163 | - WANG, X.; KIM, Y.; MA, Q.; HONG, S.H.; POKUSAEVA, K.; STURINO, J.M.; WOOD, T.K., "Cryptic prophages help bacteria cope with adverse environments", Nature Communications, (20100000), vol. 1, page 147 |