EP3626368 - SUPPORT FRAME STRUCTURE FOR SUPPORTING AT LEAST ONE FUNCTIONAL COMPONENT OF AN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concept Laser GmbH An der Zeil 8 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kremer, Viktor Von-Schaumberg-Strasse 19 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Hafner & Kohl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18195494.2 | 19.09.2018 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626368 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B29C64/245 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
B29C64/25 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (US);
B29C64/245 (US);
B29C64/268 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F12/38 (EP,US);
B22F12/44 (EP,US);
B22F12/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGRAHMENSTRUKTUR ZUM TRAGEN MINDESTENS EINER FUNKTIONSKOMPONENTE EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2020/13] | English: | SUPPORT FRAME STRUCTURE FOR SUPPORTING AT LEAST ONE FUNCTIONAL COMPONENT OF AN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS | [2020/13] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT DE CADRE POUR SUPPORTER AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT FONCTIONNEL D'UN APPAREIL DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 22.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/24] | 09.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3067132 (SLM SOLUTIONS GROUP AG [DE]) [X] 1,16 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0003] * * claims 1-15 * * figure 1 * [I] 2-15; | [A]US2017276122 (VAN DEN AKER KAREL JOHANNES ADRIANUS [NL]) [A] 1-16 * figures 3-7 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] ** paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0112] *; | [XI]EP3321065 (CL SCHUTZRECHTSVERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039] * * figure 1 * [I] 8-15 |