EP3447935 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND SIGNAL STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/09] | WIRELESS COMUNICATION METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND SIGNAL STRUCTURES | ||
[2021/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONG, Wen 12 Whitestone Drive Ottawa, ON K2C 4A7 / CA | 02 /
MA, Jianglei 3 Bon Echo Cres. Kanata, ON K2M 2W5 / CA | 03 /
JIA, Ming 345 Whitby Avenue Apt. 302 Ottawa, ON K2A 0B3 / CA | 04 /
ZHU, Peiying 16 Pebble Creek Crescent Kanata, ON K2M 2L4 / CA | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/09] | 01 /
TONG, Wen 12 Whitestone Drive Ottawa, ON K2C 4A7 / CA | ||
02 /
MA, Jianglei 3 bon Echo Cres. Kanata, ON K2M 2W5 / CA | |||
03 /
JIA, Ming 345 Whitby Avenue Apt. 302 Ottawa, ON K2A 0B3 / CA | |||
04 /
ZHU, Peiying 16 Pebble Creek Crescent Kanata, ON K2M 2L4 / CA | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 18195751.5 | 04.04.2005 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | US20040558566P | 02.04.2004 Original published format: US 558566 P | US20040559016P | 05.04.2004 Original published format: US 559016 P | US20040566009P | 28.04.2004 Original published format: US 566009 P | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447935 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3447935 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04J11/00, H03M13/05 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
H04B7/0669 (EP,US);
H04B7/0408 (EP,US);
H04B7/0667 (EP,US);
H04B7/0697 (EP,US);
H04J11/00 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H04L1/0069 (EP,US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,US);
H04L1/0625 (EP,US);
H04L1/0668 (EP,US);
H04L1/1867 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/1469 (EP,US);
H04B1/713 (EP,US);
H04B2001/6908 (EP,US);
H04J13/0074 (EP,US);
H04J13/18 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,US);
H04L1/1845 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L25/0226 (EP,US);
H04L25/0242 (EP,US);
H04L27/2603 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/09] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND SIGNALSTRUKTUREN | [2019/09] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND SIGNAL STRUCTURES | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, SYSTÈMES ET STRUCTURES DE SIGNAL | [2019/09] |
Former [2019/09] | WIRELESS COMUNICATION METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND SIGNAL STRUCTURES | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 27.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05732085.5 / EP1730864 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.04.2022 | [2023/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1359683 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] *; | [I] - TRIOLO A A ET AL, "OFDM space-time trellis coded MIMO systems with experimental results", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. MILCOM 2002. PROCEEDINGS.ANAHEIM, CA, OCT. 7 - 10, 2002; [IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE.; US, (20021007), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/MILCOM.2002.1180507, ISBN 978-0-7803-7625-0, pages 577 - 581, XP010632167 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2002.1180507 | [A] - SANG HYO KIM ET AL, "A frame synchronization scheme for uplink MC-CDMA", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1999. VTC 1999 - FALL. IEEE VTS 50TH AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS 19-22 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990919), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-5435-7, pages 2188 - 2192, XP010352999 [A] 1,7 * abstract * * Section 4 * |